This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/17/2018 at 13:21:25 (UTC).

RAJINDER ADLAKHA -V- BEE INVESTMENT INC

Case Summary

On 07/17/2013 RAJINDER ADLAKHA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BEE INVESTMENT INC. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Other - Transferred.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4991

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2013

  • Case Status:

    Other - Transferred

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAJINDER ADLAKHA

Defendants

BEE INVESTMENT INC

BEE REALTY GROUP

CENTURY 21

GLOBAL ESCROW SERVICES INC

STEVE YOON

BEE INVESTMENT, INC

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2014
  • HEARING RE: STATUS OF TRANSFER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2014
  • NOTICE OF TRANSFER OF ACTION AND REQUEST FOR RECEIPT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2014
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2014
  • VACATE HRG HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 02/19/14 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT R12.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2014
  • COPIES OF NTCE OF TRANSFER OF ACTION MAILED TO ALL PARTIES THIS DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2014
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 140110-4570 $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2014
  • COPY OF NTCE OF TRANSFER OF ACTION & REQUEST FOR RECEIPT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2014
  • TRANSFERRED TO THE STANLEY MOSK COURTHOUSE COURT - COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2013
  • ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE AND IMPOSING SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $600.00 AGAINST RAJINDER ADLAKHA FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2013
  • NOTICE OF RULING ON MOTION TO TRANSFER FILED BY STEVE YOON, BEE INVESTMENT, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 10/01/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON GLOBAL ESCROW SERVICES INC; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 09/16/13 WITH COSTS OF $45.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2013
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2013
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY RAJINDER ADLAKHA IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2013
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON RAJINDER ADLAKHA FOR FILING FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2013
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY RAJINDER ADLAKHA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2013
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2013
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2013
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2013
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2013
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT R12

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BEE REALTY GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases where GLOBAL ESCROW SERVICE INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION AKA GLOBAL ES is a litigant

Latest cases where CENTURY 21 A BETTER SERVICE REALTY is a litigant

Latest cases where BEE INVESTMENT INC is a litigant