This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/15/2018 at 02:04:32 (UTC).

RAFAEL M HERNANDEZ -N- VERONICA BARVA

Case Summary

On 10/04/2017 RAFAEL M HERNANDEZ -N- VERONICA BARVA was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8586

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

RAFAEL MENDOZA HERNANDEZ

Respondent

VRONICA BARVA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2018
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DATE MARITAL STATUS TERMINATES 04/14/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON 1ST AMENDED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH CHILDREN OF RAFAEL HERNANDEZ FILED; Minutes; FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON 1ST AMENDED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH CHILDREN OF RAFAEL HERNANDEZ ORDERED ENTERED 02/14/18; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION -- JUDGMENT AFTER HEARING.(FL); DISPOSITION: JUDGMENT AFTER HEARING (FL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • DEFAULT HEARING; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; TERESA S BENNETT, JUDGE; CLERK: ROSEMARY ROJAS; COURT REPORTER THERESA MADRIGAL 8510; BAILIFF: C BARAJAS; APPEARANCES:; PETITIONER RAFAEL MENDOZA HERNANDEZ PRESENT; RESPONDENT VRONICA BARVA PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; OSC/MOTION HELD.; WITNESS -- RAFAEL M HERNANDEZ & VERONICA BARVA ARE/ IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; THE COURT INQUIRES OF BOTH PARTIES.; THE COURT RESERVES JURISDICTION ON THE FOLLOWING ISSUES: SPOUSAL SUPPORT .; THE REAL ESTATE LOCATED AT 837 EAST I ST. ONTARIO CA 91764 IS CONFIRMED TO VERONICA BARVA. THE 2013; NISSAN ARMADA HAS BEEN SOLD. THE PENSION THROUGH PERS IS CONFIRMED TO VERONICA BARVA.; THE PETITIONER IS CONFIRMED THE LACERA PENSION.; JUDGMENT IS SIGNED THIS DATE.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • RETURN MAIL: NOTICE OF DEFAULT PROVE UP HEARING RECEIVED BACK FROM RAFAEL MENDOZA HERNANDEZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • JUDGMENT PLACED ON LEFT SIDE OF FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • NOTICE OF PROVE UP HEARING SENT.; Minutes; PLEASE BE ADVISED THAT A PROVE UP HEARING HAS BEEN SET BY THE COURT REGARDING SPOUSAL SUPPORT; AND REAL PROPERTY. IT IS SCHEDULED FOR FEBRUARY 14, 2018 AT 8:30AM IN DEPARTMENT S46.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT FILED ON VRONICA BARVA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • COMMUNITY AND QUASI COMMUNITY PROPERTY DECLARATION OF RAFAEL MENDOZA HERNANDEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON 1ST AMENDED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH CHILDREN OF RAFAEL HERNANDEZ AS TO VRONICA BARVA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY RAFAEL MENDOZA HERNANDEZ FOR PRELIM/FINAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 10/04/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON RAFAEL MENDOZA HERNANDEZ FOR 1ST APP FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY RAFAEL MENDOZA HERNANDEZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY RAFAEL MENDOZA HERNANDEZ IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • COMMUNITY AND QUASI COMMUNITY PROPERTY DECLARATION OF RAFAEL MENDOZA HERNANDEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • DECLARATION UNDER UCCJEA FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • FAMILY LAW SUMMONS ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • FAMILY LAW CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S46

    Read MoreRead Less