This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/13/2018 at 00:01:27 (UTC).

MTR OF RICHARD DENNIS SMITH

Case Summary

On 09/07/2016 MTR OF RICHARD DENNIS SMITH was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0892

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MARK SMITH

Decedent

RICHARD DENNIS SMITH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ROBERTA L. TAYLOR & ASSOCIATES

16195 Siskiyou Road Suite #130

Apple Valley, CA 92307

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION AND ORDER FOR FINAL DISCHARGE FILED.

DECLARATION AND ORDER FOR FINAL DISCHARGE FILED.; Minutes; ACTION - COMPLETE; CASE CLOSED.

CONFIRMATION OF PAYMENT OF SOUTH WEST GAS FILED.

CONFIRMATION OF PAYMENT OF SOUTH WEST GAS FILED.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

RECEIPT RE: FINAL DISTRIBUTION/MARK SMITH FILED.

RECEIPT RE: FINAL DISTRIBUTION/MARK SMITH FILED.

RECEIPT RE: FINAL DISTRIBUTION/JEFFREY R SMITH FILED.

RECEIPT RE: FINAL DISTRIBUTION/JEFFREY R SMITH FILED.

ORDER SETTLING FIRST AND FINAL WAIVER OF ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF STATUS OF ADMINISTRATION FILED

ORDER SETTLING FIRST AND FINAL WAIVER OF ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF STATUS OF ADMINISTRATION FILED

NOTICE OF HEARING ON FIRST AND FINAL WAIVER OF ACCOUNT AND REPORT FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON FIRST AND FINAL WAIVER OF ACCOUNT AND REPORT FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF NTC OF PROPOSED ACTION BY MAIL ON 03/02/17 AS TO MARTK SMITH/JEFFREY SMITH, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF NTC OF PROPOSED ACTION BY MAIL ON 03/02/17 AS TO MARTK SMITH/JEFFREY SMITH, FILED.

NOTICE OF PROPOSED ACTION

NOTICE OF PROPOSED ACTION

ALLOWANCE OF CREDITOR'S CLAIM OF SOUTHWEST GAS CORPORATION IN THE AMOUNT OF $33.60 FILED.

ALLOWANCE OF CREDITOR'S CLAIM OF SOUTHWEST GAS CORPORATION IN THE AMOUNT OF $33.60 FILED.

NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION TO CREDITORS FILED.

NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION TO CREDITORS FILED.

ORDER APPOINTING ADMINISTRATOR, MARK SMITH APPOINTED WITH FULL IAEA. BOND IS NOT REQ., PATRICK WRIGHT APPOINTED PROBATE REFEREE, FILED.

ORDER APPOINTING ADMINISTRATOR, MARK SMITH APPOINTED WITH FULL IAEA. BOND IS NOT REQ., PATRICK WRIGHT APPOINTED PROBATE REFEREE, FILED.

LETTERS ISSUED ( ADMINISTRATION)

LETTERS ISSUED ( ADMINISTRATION)

PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED.

PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED.

SUPPLEMENTAL (VERIFIED) DECLARATION OF JOELLE LEE A. NICOL, ESQ. FILED. (IMAGED)

SUPPLEMENTAL (VERIFIED) DECLARATION OF JOELLE LEE A. NICOL, ESQ. FILED. (IMAGED)

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY MARK SMITH

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY MARK SMITH

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

PETITION RE: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION W/FULL IAEA FILED.

PETITION RE: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION W/FULL IAEA FILED.

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2018
  • HEARING RE FINAL DISCHARGE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION AND ORDER FOR FINAL DISCHARGE FILED.; Minutes; ACTION - COMPLETE; CASE CLOSED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON EXPARTE PETITION FOR FINAL RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CONFIRMATION OF PAYMENT OF SOUTH WEST GAS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • EX PARTE PET FOR FINAL DISCHARG & ORDR IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): SEE ATTACHED RETURN SLIP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON EX PARTE PET FOR FINAL DISCHARGE AND ORDER RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT RE: FINAL DISTRIBUTION/MARK SMITH FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT RE: FINAL DISTRIBUTION/JEFFREY R SMITH FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT RE: FINAL DISTRIBUTION/ROBERTA L TAYLOR FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 10/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 10/19/16 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY MARK SMITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S35P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY MARK SMITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2016
  • CONFIDENTIAL STATEMENT OF BIRTH DATE AND DRIVER'S LICENSE NUMBER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2016
  • PROPOSED LETTERS RECEIVED (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2016
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON ORDER FOR PROBATE RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION RE: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION W/FULL IAEA FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2016
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (PROBATE); Minutes; Receipt: 160907-0245 $465.00; 160907-0245-CK Reference Number 6047

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.