Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/08/2018 at 07:01:55 (UTC).

PSS RANCHO HAVEN-V-ROUNDS

Case Summary

On 07/17/2017 PSS RANCHO HAVEN-V-ROUNDS was filed as a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4896

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PSS RANCHO HAVEN, LLC

Defendant

MELODY ROUNDS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF JENNIFER I FREEDMAN

4225 Executive Square Suite 490

La Jolla, CA 92037

 

Court Documents

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $85.00.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $85.00.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $85.00.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $85.00.

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( PLACED IN ATTORNEY BIN)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( PLACED IN ATTORNEY BIN); Minutes; Receipt: 170822-0328 $25.00; 170822-0328-CK Reference Number 103397

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 07/17/2017 OF PSS RANCHO HAVEN, LLC ORDERED ENTERED 08/16/17; JUDGMENT FOR: PSS RANCHO HAVEN, LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: MELODY ROUNDS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: MELODY ROUNDS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON MELODY ROUNDS.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON MELODY ROUNDS.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET BY POSTING ON MELODY ROUNDS; POSTED ON 07/28/17 WITH FEES OF $144.50.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET BY POSTING ON MELODY ROUNDS; POSTED ON 07/28/17 WITH FEES OF $144.50.

ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR POSTING AND MAILING GRANTED AND FILED WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $20.00.

ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR POSTING AND MAILING GRANTED AND FILED WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $20.00.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170717-0766 $255.00; 170717-0766-CK Reference Number 101153

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON MELODY ROUNDS FOR COPIES IN THE AMOUNT OF $19.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY MELODY ROUNDS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY MELODY ROUNDS IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • REQUEST FOR FURTHER ACTION/COURT ORDER RE: FEE WAIVER REQUEST FOR COPIES ONLY SENT DEPARTMENT F8 FOR REVIEW.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $85.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( PLACED IN ATTORNEY BIN); Minutes; Receipt: 170822-0328 $25.00; 170822-0328-CK Reference Number 103397

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 07/17/2017 OF PSS RANCHO HAVEN, LLC ORDERED ENTERED 08/16/17; JUDGMENT FOR: PSS RANCHO HAVEN, LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: MELODY ROUNDS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: MELODY ROUNDS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 08/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON MELODY ROUNDS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 07/17/2017 OF PSS RANCHO HAVEN, LLC AS TO MELODY ROUNDS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET BY POSTING ON MELODY ROUNDS; POSTED ON 07/28/17 WITH FEES OF $144.50.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • UNDELIVERED: NOTICE OF FILING OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER ACTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO POST SUMMONS & COMPLAINT FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170726-0868 $20.00; 170726-0868-CK Reference Number 101231

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR POSTING AND MAILING GRANTED AND FILED WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $20.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170717-0766 $255.00; 170717-0766-CK Reference Number 101153

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT F8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $1.47.--BEGINNING ON 07/12/17

    Read MoreRead Less