This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/07/2018 at 12:52:16 (UTC).

PROFESSIONAL COLLECTION -V- SERNA

Case Summary

On 02/01/2016 PROFESSIONAL COLLECTION filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against SERNA. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1924

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PROFESSIONAL COLLECTION CONSULTANTS

Defendant

DAVID SERNA

Assignees

MID VALLEY COLLECTIONS BUREAU,

WIRELESS RECEIVABLES ACQUISITION GROUP,

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Assignee Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF CLARK GAREN

6700 S Centinela Ave Third Floor

Culver City, CA 90230

GAREN, CLARK

6700 S. Centinela Avenue Third Floor

Culver City, CA 90230

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2018
  • ON RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED 02/01/2016 OF PROFESSIONAL COLLECTION CONSULTANTS, WIRELESS RECEIVABLES ACQUISITION GROUP, REMOVED AS A PARTY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT ON RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED 02/01/2016 OF PROFESSIONAL COLLECTION CONSULTANTS FILED ADDING MID VALLEY COLLECTIONS BUREAU, AS THE ASSIGNEE OF THIS JUDGMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT ON RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED 02/01/2016 OF PROFESSIONAL COLLECTION CONSULTANTS FILED ADDING WIRELESS RECEIVABLES ACQUISITION GROUP, AS THE ASSIGNEE OF THIS JUDGMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2016
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 160307-0757 $27.50; 160307-0757-CK Reference Number CK 170732

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2016
  • NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT RETURNED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT SERVED ON 03/02/16.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • ROJ FILED 02/01/16 ORIGINAL CASE NUMBER SCISS143618

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT ISSUED. COPY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • ORIGINAL DOCS FOR SCISS143618

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY PROFESSIONAL COLLECTION CONSULTANTS FOR RENEWAL; Minutes; Receipt: 160209-0169 $30.00; 160209-0169-CK Reference Number 255764

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • PLAINTIFF PROFESSIONAL COLLECTION CONSULTANTS FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • MEMO OF COSTS FILED BY PROFESSIONAL COLLECTION CONSULTANTS, FOR 77.00 COSTS/1144.00 INTEREST.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S35

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED.; Minutes; ORIGINAL JUDGMENT ENTERED 01/08/07 IS ORDERED RENEWED AS FOLLOWS:; IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED THAT PROFESSIONAL COLLECTION CONSULTANTS HAVE &; RECOVER FROM DAVID SERNA:; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,507.66 INTEREST $1,144.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $30.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,681.66; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OTHER CLERK JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OTHER CLERK JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less