This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/08/2018 at 21:35:48 (UTC).

PRINCETON -V- VILLALVAZO

Case Summary

On 10/30/2017 PRINCETON -V- VILLALVAZO was filed as a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8338

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PRINCETON VILLAGE CONDOMINIUM OWENERS

Defendant

MARTHA A. VILLALVAZO

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SC-100 FILED AS TO MARTHA A. VILLALVAZO. PARTY SERVED ON 11/15/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $125.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SC-100 FILED AS TO MARTHA A. VILLALVAZO. PARTY SERVED ON 11/15/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $125.00.

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Action Dispo: Judgment

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Action Dispo: Judgment; Minutes; LYNN PONCIN, JUDGE; CLERK: SHOSHONE NEAL; BAILIFF: S WADDY; APPEARANCES:; PRINCETON VILLAGE CONDOMINIUM OWENERS REPRESENTED BY ROBERT REMLEY.; DEFENDANT MARTHA A. VILLALVAZO PRESENT; FERNANDO LOPEZ PRESENT TO ASSIST DEFENDANT; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; SMALL CLAIMS REFERRAL TO MEDIATION; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 11:37; STIPULATION REACHED. SEE STIPULATION ON FILE FOR PARTICULARS.; IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED THAT JUDGMENT SHALL BE ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:; JUDGMENT FOR: PRINCETON VILLAGE CONDOMINIUM OWENERS; JUDGMENT AGAINST: MARTHA A. VILLALVAZO; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $2,687.40 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $175.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,862.40; MONEY JUDGMENT SHALL BE PAID AT THE RATE OF $100.00 PER MONTH BEGINNING 01/10/18. EACH PAYMENT THEREAFTER SHALL BE DUE ON THE 10TH DAY OF EACH FOLLOWING MONTH.; IF THE DEFENDANT SHOULD DEFAULT ON ANY TERMS OF THIS AGREEMENT, THE ENTIRE JUDGMENT SHALL BECOME IMMEDIATELY DUE.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CONTESTED (SC); 11:39; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

STIPULATION RE: JUDGMENT FILED.

STIPULATION RE: JUDGMENT FILED.

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 171030-0894 $50.00; 171030-0894-CK Reference Number 11616

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PRINCETON VILLAGE CONDOMINIUM OWENERS FILED.

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PRINCETON VILLAGE CONDOMINIUM OWENERS FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 12/27/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PRINCETON VILLAGE CONDOMINIUM OWENERS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION RE: JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Action Dispo: Judgment; Minutes; LYNN PONCIN, JUDGE; CLERK: SHOSHONE NEAL; BAILIFF: S WADDY; APPEARANCES:; PRINCETON VILLAGE CONDOMINIUM OWENERS REPRESENTED BY ROBERT REMLEY.; DEFENDANT MARTHA A. VILLALVAZO PRESENT; FERNANDO LOPEZ PRESENT TO ASSIST DEFENDANT; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; SMALL CLAIMS REFERRAL TO MEDIATION; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 11:37; STIPULATION REACHED. SEE STIPULATION ON FILE FOR PARTICULARS.; IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED THAT JUDGMENT SHALL BE ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:; JUDGMENT FOR: PRINCETON VILLAGE CONDOMINIUM OWENERS; JUDGMENT AGAINST: MARTHA A. VILLALVAZO; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $2,687.40 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $175.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,862.40; MONEY JUDGMENT SHALL BE PAID AT THE RATE OF $100.00 PER MONTH BEGINNING 01/10/18. EACH PAYMENT THEREAFTER SHALL BE DUE ON THE 10TH DAY OF EACH FOLLOWING MONTH.; IF THE DEFENDANT SHOULD DEFAULT ON ANY TERMS OF THIS AGREEMENT, THE ENTIRE JUDGMENT SHALL BECOME IMMEDIATELY DUE.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CONTESTED (SC); 11:39; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • POS RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SC-100 FILED AS TO MARTHA A. VILLALVAZO. PARTY SERVED ON 11/15/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $125.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 171030-0894 $50.00; 171030-0894-CK Reference Number 11616

    Read MoreRead Less