This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 06/09/2018 at 09:07:16 (UTC).

PRINCE -V- CURNUTTE

Case Summary

On 01/27/2017 PRINCE filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against CURNUTTE. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Joshua Tree District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0030

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Joshua Tree District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JACK PRINCE

Defendant

CYNTHIA CURNUTTE

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF RICHARD M GHAN

55198 Twentynine Palms Highway Suite 1

Yucca Valley, CA 92284

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION REGARDING EX-PARTE NOTICE FILED.

DECLARATION REGARDING EX-PARTE NOTICE FILED.

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER FILED.

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER FILED.

NOTICE OF MOTION FOR STAY OF ENFORCEMENT P&AS/DECLARATION FILED.

NOTICE OF MOTION FOR STAY OF ENFORCEMENT P&AS/DECLARATION FILED.

EX PARTE MOTION ORDER - DENIED FILED.

EX PARTE MOTION ORDER - DENIED FILED.

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( CALLED ATTY FOR PICKUP ON 4/24/17)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( CALLED ATTY FOR PICKUP ON 4/24/17); Minutes; Receipt: 170424-0090 $25.00; 170424-0090-CK Reference Number 5720

SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.

SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.

STIP FOR APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS JUDGE PRO TEM FILED

STIP FOR APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS JUDGE PRO TEM FILED

REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 01:00 HOURS.

REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 01:00 HOURS.

COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

STIP FOR APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS JUDGE PRO TEM FILED

STIP FOR APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS JUDGE PRO TEM FILED

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 03/03/17 WITH FEES OF $0.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 03/03/17 WITH FEES OF $0.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON CYNTHIA CURNUTTE; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 03/03/17

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON CYNTHIA CURNUTTE; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 03/03/17

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ANSWER FILED BY CYNTHIA CURNUTTE; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

ANSWER FILED BY CYNTHIA CURNUTTE; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170127-0320 $255.00; 170127-0320-CK Reference Number 5693

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION REGARDING EX-PARTE NOTICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • EX-PARTE MOTION RE: STAY EXECUTION OF JUDGMENT; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; JOEL AGRON, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: KIMBERLEY HANNA; MATTER NOT REPORTED OR ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: JACK PRINCE, CYNTHIA CURNUTTE; PROCEEDINGS:; POST-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD; DECLARATION REGARDING EXPARTE NOTICE FILED.; EX-PARTE HEARING IS HELD.; EX PARTE ORDERS DENIED.; NO FUTURE HEARING DATE SET; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF MOTION FOR STAY OF ENFORCEMENT P&AS/DECLARATION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • EX PARTE MOTION ORDER - DENIED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • EX-PARTE MOTION RE: STAY; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; JOEL AGRON, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: KIMBERLEY HANNA; MATTER NOT REPORTED OR ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: JACK PRINCE, CYNTHIA CURNUTTE; PROCEEDINGS:; POST-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD; IN-CAMERA HEARING HELD.; EX-PARTE HEARING IS HELD.; EX PARTE ORDERS DENIED.; NO FUTURE HEARING DATE SET; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • EX-PARTE HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 4/28/17 AT 8:29 IN DEPARTMENT M4 - RESCHEDULED TO:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • EX-PARTE HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 4/28/17 AT 8:29 IN DEPARTMENT M4X

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT M4X

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • EX-PARTE MOTION RE: STAY TO BE HEARD ON 04/28/17 AT 08:29 IN DEPARTMENT M4.

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 03/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER FILED BY CYNTHIA CURNUTTE; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 170309-0709 $1.00; 170309-0709-DB Reference Number 026-0012348951

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 170303-0895 $0.74

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • ADA NOTICE MAILED OUT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • 3/20/17 8:30

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • 3/20/17 8:30

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170127-0320 $255.00; 170127-0320-CK Reference Number 5693

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT M4

    Read MoreRead Less