This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/13/2018 at 03:14:44 (UTC).

PRESTON HAMMOND

Case Summary

On 12/05/2016 PRESTON HAMMOND was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1201

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SHIRLEY HAMMOND

Decedent

PRESTON HAMMOND

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

AUTON-BECK, BETTY

300 E. State Street Suite 600

Redlands, CA 92373

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY SHIRLEY HAMMOND

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY SHIRLEY HAMMOND

WAIVER OF BOND BY HEIR OR BENEFICIARY FILED.

WAIVER OF BOND BY HEIR OR BENEFICIARY FILED.

HRG OF 02/06/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 02/06/17 - PROBATE NOTES

DECREE OF FINAL DISTRIBUTION ON WAIVER OF ACCOUNT AND APPROVAL OF STATUTORY COMMISSIONS FILED.

DECREE OF FINAL DISTRIBUTION ON WAIVER OF ACCOUNT AND APPROVAL OF STATUTORY COMMISSIONS FILED.

RECEIPT FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION RECEIVED FROM SHIRLEY HAMMOND FILED.

RECEIPT FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION RECEIVED FROM SHIRLEY HAMMOND FILED.

RECEIPT RE: STATUTORY ATTORNEYS FEES FILED.

RECEIPT RE: STATUTORY ATTORNEYS FEES FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

RECEIPT FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION RECEIVED FROM JONATHAN HAMMOND FILED.

RECEIPT FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION RECEIVED FROM JONATHAN HAMMOND FILED.

INVENTORY AND APPRAISAL: FINAL ILED.

INVENTORY AND APPRAISAL: FINAL ILED.

DECLARATION AND ORDER FOR FINAL DISCHARGE FILED.

DECLARATION AND ORDER FOR FINAL DISCHARGE FILED.; Minutes; ACTION - COMPLETE; CASE CLOSED.

LETTERS ISSUED ( OF ADMINISTRATION W. FULL IAEA)

LETTERS ISSUED ( OF ADMINISTRATION W. FULL IAEA)

DECLINATION & NOMINATION, PRESTON HAMMOND JR FILED.

DECLINATION & NOMINATION, PRESTON HAMMOND JR FILED.

PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION WITH FULL AUTHORITY UNDER IAEA - FILED.

PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION WITH FULL AUTHORITY UNDER IAEA - FILED.

WAIVER OF BOND BY HEIR OR BENEFICIARY , PRESTON H. FILED.

WAIVER OF BOND BY HEIR OR BENEFICIARY , PRESTON H. FILED.

HRG OF 09/19/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 09/19/17 - PROBATE NOTES

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY SHIRLEY HAMMOND

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY SHIRLEY HAMMOND

HRG OF 09/19/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 09/19/17 - PROBATE NOTES

DECLINATION & NOMINATION, JONATHAN HAMMOND FILED.

DECLINATION & NOMINATION, JONATHAN HAMMOND FILED.

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2018
  • HEARING RE FINAL DISCHARGE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • ACCOUNTING REVIEW BY; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • VACATE HRFD HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 09/25/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S35P.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION AND ORDER FOR FINAL DISCHARGE FILED.; Minutes; ACTION - COMPLETE; CASE CLOSED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT RE: STATUTORY ATTORNEYS FEES FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON EXPARTE PET FOR FINAL DISCHARGE RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION RECEIVED FROM PRESTON HAMMOND JR FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION RECEIVED FROM JONATHAN HAMMOND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION RECEIVED FROM SHIRLEY HAMMOND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT RE: STATUTORY COMMISSIONS BY SHIRLEY HAMMOND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • WAIVER OF BOND BY HEIR OR BENEFICIARY , PRESTON H. FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY SHIRLEY HAMMOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY SHIRLEY HAMMOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2016
  • CONFIDENTIAL STATEMENT OF BIRTH DATE AND DRIVER'S LICENSE NUMBER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S35P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION WITH FULL AUTHORITY UNDER IAEA - FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2016
  • PROPOSED LETTERS RECEIVED (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2016
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON PROBATE RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2016
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (PROBATE); Minutes; Receipt: 161206-0174 $465.00; 161206-0174-CK Reference Number 2066

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.