This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/08/2021 at 02:19:49 (UTC).

PRESERVER -V- RICHARD CASTEEL, ETAL

Case Summary

On 05/16/2011 PRESERVER filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against RICHARD CASTEEL, ETAL. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Gibson, John B, Mahlum, Kirtland L and Morton, Miriam I. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0258

  • Filing Date:

    05/16/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judges

Gibson, John B

Mahlum, Kirtland L

Morton, Miriam I

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified

CONV

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF JURY TRIAL FILED BY PRESERVER INSURANCE

10/29/2012: NOTICE OF JURY TRIAL FILED BY PRESERVER INSURANCE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE. - STA

01/29/2013: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE. - STA

 

Docket Entries

04/18/2013

DocketComment:; Comment: $150.00 JURY FEES FORFEITED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/25/2013

DocketLegacy Minutes; Comment: JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/25/2013

DocketJury Trial; Original Type: Jury Trial; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/22/2013

DocketLegacy Minutes; Comment: READINESS CALENDAR

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/22/2013

DocketReadiness Calendar; Original Type: Readiness Calendar; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: READINESS CALENDAR

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/29/2013

DispositionJudgment; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Request for Dismissal; Comment; Comment: (REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/29/2013
View Court Documents

DocketRequest for Dismissal Filed; Comment: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE. - STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/13/2012

DocketLegacy Minutes; Comment: JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/13/2012

DocketJury Trial; Original Type: Jury Trial; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/09/2012

DocketLegacy Minutes; Judicial Officer: Morton, Miriam I; Comment: READINESS CALENDAR MIRIAM I. MORTON,JUDGE CLERK: CAROL MAUK COURT REPORTER VALERIE FOSTER;9413 - APPEARANCES: SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY GLENN NAKAWAKI FOR PLAINTIFF. ATTORNEY JENNIFER MILLER PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT. - PROCEEDINGS: ACTION CAME ON FOR TRIAL READINESS. PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD DECLARATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL FILED BY PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL. - VACATE JT HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 11/13/12 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT B4. - HEARINGS: CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 02/22/13 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT B4. JURY TRIAL SET FOR 02/25/13 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT B4 ESTIMATED DURATION OF 0 DAYS. NOTICE WAIVED. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END ===

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
51 More Docket Entries
07/05/2011

FinancialCONV; Counter Payment; Receipt # 20110705-3099; ConversionPayment; $240.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/05/2011

FinancialCONV; Transaction Assessment; $240.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/05/2011

DocketVacate Hearing Scheduled; Comment: VACATE OSCSV HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 08/17/11 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT B3.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/05/2011

DocketAnswer Filed; Comment: ANSWER FILED BY RICHARD CASTEEL; PARTY REPRESENTED BY LAW OFFICE OF RICHARD K DWYER. 110705-3099-CK CAO/ 240.00 PAYMT 110705-3099-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 601424159

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/17/2011

FinancialCONV; Counter Payment; Receipt # 20110517-1775; ConversionPayment; $240.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/17/2011

FinancialCONV; Transaction Assessment; $240.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/16/2011

FinancialCONV; Total Financial Assessment: $500.00; Total Payments and Credits: $500.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/16/2011

DocketSummons Issued on; Comment: SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF PRESERVER INSURANCE COMPANY - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/16/2011

DocketCase Assigned for All Purposes; Comment: CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT B3

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/16/2011

DocketComplaint and Party Information Entered; Comment: COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED 110517-1775-CK CLS/ 240.00 PAYMT 110517-1775-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 209113

[+] Read More [-] Read Less