This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 04/27/2021 at 17:56:41 (UTC).

PORUSH -V- CALICARE DRUGS

Case Summary

On 02/14/2020 PORUSH filed an Other lawsuit against CALICARE DRUGS. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Garza, Thomas S. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4727

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Not Yet Classified

Garza, Thomas S

 

Party Details

Petitioners

LISA PORUSH

PORUSH, LISA

Respondent

CALICARE DRUGS PHARMACY , INC

Not Yet Classified

CONV

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF JULIO R BARDAVID

1591 Ventura Boulevard Suite 1405

Encino, CA 91436

Bardavid, Julio Robert

 

Court Documents

Notice Returning Documents

01/05/2021: Notice Returning Documents

**CV - Portal Minute Order

12/21/2020: **CV - Portal Minute Order

NOTICE IMAGED

04/09/2020: NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

02/18/2020: NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

02/14/2020: NOTICE IMAGED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

02/14/2020: CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

02/14/2020: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

PETITION FILED (CIVIL)

02/14/2020: PETITION FILED (CIVIL)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2021
  • FinancialPORUSH, LISA; Fax Filing; Receipt # SC-2021-00650; Bardavid, Julio Robert; $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • FinancialPORUSH, LISA; Transaction Assessment; $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: $4.00 VISA paid on 01/06/21 for Fax Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocument is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):; Comment: Dismissal case dismissed by court on 12/21/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: Garza, Thomas S; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Court-Ordered - Before Trial; Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketRemote hearing held; Comment: Remote hearing held pursuant to Judicial Council Emergency Rule of Court 3(a)(3).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketLegacy Minutes; Comment: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE:FURTHER STATUS OF POS/FTA POTENTIAL SANCTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Predisposition; Judicial Officer: Garza, Thomas S; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE:FURTHER STATUS OF POS/FTA POTENTIAL SANCTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • FinancialPORUSH, LISA; Legacy Balance Adjustment; $425.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • FinancialPORUSH, LISA; Transaction Assessment; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 02/14/2020
  • FinancialPORUSH, LISA; Total Financial Assessment: $439.00; Total Payments and Credits: $429.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Imaged; Comment: NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: FILING FEE PAID BY LISA PORUSH FOR 1ST APPEARANCE FEE 200214-1014-CK CVT/ 425.00 PAYMT 200214-1014-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 3201

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketFee Voided; Comment: ** VOID ** FEE RECEIPT# 200214-0770 VOIDED BY ANTMA FROM JHARN CHARGED WRONG AMOUNT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff First Paper Fee Previously Paid in Full; Comment: PLAINTIFF LISA PORUSH FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: FILING FEE PAID BY LISA PORUSH FOR 1ST APPEARANCE FEE 200214-0770-CK CVH/ 435.00 PAYMT 200214-0770-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 3201

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Assignment Received; Comment: CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed; Comment: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketSet Default Department to; Comment: SET DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO S27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition Filed (Civil); Comment: PETITION FILED (CIVIL)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CONV is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BARDAVID JULIO R.