This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 13:15:34 (UTC).

PORTILLO-V-BRADSHAW INTERNATIONAL

Case Summary

On 10/30/2017 PORTILLO-V-BRADSHAW INTERNATIONAL was filed as a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1426

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

YESENIA PORTILLO

Defendants

ROBERTO ROJAS

BRADSHAW INTERNATIONAL, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF CARLIN & BUCHSBAUM, LLP

555 East Ocean Blvd, Ste 818

Long Beach, CA 90802

Defendant Attorney

SNELL & WILMER

600 Anton Blvd, Ste 1400

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

 

Court Documents

AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY BRADSHAW INTERNATIONAL, INC., ROBERTO ROJAS

AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY BRADSHAW INTERNATIONAL, INC., ROBERTO ROJAS

NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE FILED BY YESENIA PORTILLO.

NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE FILED BY YESENIA PORTILLO.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY YESENIA PORTILLO.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY YESENIA PORTILLO.

ANSWER FILED BY BRADSHAW INTERNATIONAL, INC., ROBERTO ROJAS; PARTY REPRESENTED BY SNELL & WILMER.

ANSWER FILED BY BRADSHAW INTERNATIONAL, INC., ROBERTO ROJAS; PARTY REPRESENTED BY SNELL & WILMER.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO ROBERTO ROJAS SERVED ON 11/28/17 WITH FEES OF $99.50.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO ROBERTO ROJAS SERVED ON 11/28/17 WITH FEES OF $99.50.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON BRADSHAW INTERNATIONAL, INC.; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 11/10/17 WITH COSTS OF $109.50 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON BRADSHAW INTERNATIONAL, INC.; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 11/10/17 WITH COSTS OF $109.50 FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2019
  • JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • READINESS CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; THOMAS S. GARZA, JUDGE; CLERK: JENNIFER MEDINA; COURT REPORTER MARIANNE REID 11053; COURT ATTENDANT A MARTINEZ; APPEARANCES:; ANA L. DE LA TORRE APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR YESENIA PORTILLO.; BRIAN MILLS APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR BRADSHAW INTERNATIONAL, INC., ROBERTO ROJAS.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; PARTIES ANNOUNCE READY FOR TRIAL.; JURY DEMANDED BY PLAINTIFF.; TRIAL ESTIMATE IS 5-7 DAYS; TRIAL SETTING ORDERS ISSUED.; TRIAL SETTING ORDERS SENT TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT.; COURT SETS A PRIVATE MEDIATION COMPLETION DATE OF FEBRUARY 28, 2019. THIS IS A NON-APPEARANCE DATE.; PARTIES ARE TO MEET AND CONFER REGARDING COURT SPONSORED MEDITATION. COUNSEL TO CONTACT THE; JUDICIAL ASSISTANT IN S27 TO SCHEDULE AN AGREED UPON MEDIATION DATE ON A THURSDAY OR FRIDAY AT; EITHER 8:30AM OR 1:30PM FOR NOVEMBER 2018 OR LATER.; HEARINGS:; SET ON TRIAL READINESS/ASSIGNMENT CALENDAR FOR 04/25/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S27; JURY TRIAL SET FOR 04/29/19 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT S27 ESTIMATED DURATION OF 7 DAYS.; NOTICE WAIVED.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL TRIAL SETTING ORDERS TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY BRADSHAW INTERNATIONAL, INC., ROBERTO ROJAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE FILED BY YESENIA PORTILLO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY YESENIA PORTILLO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • ADVANCED JURY FEES POSTED FOR YESENIA PORTILLO.; Minutes; Receipt: 180406-0264 $150.00; 180406-0264-CK Reference Number 16329

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • DEFENDANT BRADSHAW INTERNATIONAL, INC., ROBERTO ROJAS FIRST PAPER FEE PAID IN FULL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY BRADSHAW INTERNATIONAL, INC., ROBERTO ROJAS FOR 1ST APP FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 171222-0561 $870.00; 171222-0561-CK Reference Number CK 111200

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER FILED BY BRADSHAW INTERNATIONAL, INC., ROBERTO ROJAS; PARTY REPRESENTED BY SNELL & WILMER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO ROBERTO ROJAS SERVED ON 11/28/17 WITH FEES OF $99.50.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON BRADSHAW INTERNATIONAL, INC.; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 11/10/17 WITH COSTS OF $109.50 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY YESENIA PORTILLO FOR FIRST APPEARANCE; Minutes; Receipt: 171030-0300 $435.00; 171030-0300-CK Reference Number 15854

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less