This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/10/2018 at 06:02:54 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO-V-THOMPSON

Case Summary

On 12/14/2016 PORTFOLIO-V-THOMPSON was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1689

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES,LLC

Defendant

AMALIA M THOMPSON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HUNT & HENRIQUES

151 Bernal Rd Suite 8

San Jose, CA 95119

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON AMALIA M THOMPSON; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 01/16/17 WITH COSTS OF $57.50 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON AMALIA M THOMPSON; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 01/16/17 WITH COSTS OF $57.50 FILED.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/26/2017
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • VACATE OSCSVC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 06/29/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON AMALIA M THOMPSON; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 01/16/17 WITH COSTS OF $57.50 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • PRAYED FOR AMOUNT AND/OR DAMAGES IN THE AMOUNT OF $2,204.30

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • PRAYER FOR INTEREST PERCENTAGE RATE OF 0.00 PER ANNUM BEGINNING DATE OF 08/25/14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES,LLC FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 161221-0375 $240.00; 161221-0375-CK Reference Number 665038

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.