This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/10/2018 at 04:52:48 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO-V-PADILLA

Case Summary

On 12/14/2016 PORTFOLIO-V-PADILLA was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1286

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES,LLC

Defendant

JOSE M PADILLA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HUNT & HENRIQUES

151 Bernal Rd Suite 8

San Jose, CA 95119

 

Court Documents

SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT JURISDICTION RETAINED UNDER CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 664.6 FILED.

SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT JURISDICTION RETAINED UNDER CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 664.6 FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

ORDER ON SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND STIPULATION FOR JUDGMENT FILED

ORDER ON SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND STIPULATION FOR JUDGMENT FILED

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON JOSE M PADILLA; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 01/08/17 WITH COSTS OF $57.50 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON JOSE M PADILLA; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 01/08/17 WITH COSTS OF $57.50 FILED.

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2017
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND STIPULATION FOR JUDGMENT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • DEFENDANT JOSE M PADILLA FIRST PAPER FEE PAID IN FULL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES,LLC FOR STIP AND ORDER; Minutes; Receipt: 170524-0736 $20.00; 170524-0736-CK Reference Number 705785

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY JOSE M PADILLA FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 170524-0734 $240.00; 170524-0734-CK Reference Number 705784

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT JURISDICTION RETAINED UNDER CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 664.6 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2017
  • VACATE OSCSVC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 06/26/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON JOSE M PADILLA; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 01/08/17 WITH COSTS OF $57.50 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • PRAYED FOR AMOUNT AND/OR DAMAGES IN THE AMOUNT OF $2,605.38

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • PRAYER FOR INTEREST PERCENTAGE RATE OF 0.00 PER ANNUM BEGINNING DATE OF 05/01/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES,LLC FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 161216-0703 $240.00; 161216-0703-CK Reference Number 665026

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.