This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 06:07:54 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY -V- WALLACE

Case Summary

On 09/27/2017 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against WALLACE. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8658

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES,LLC

Defendant

HARRIET WALLACE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HUNT & HENRIQUES

151 Bernal Rd Suite 8

San Jose, CA 95119

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION OF COUNSEL RE: INTEREST,COSTS CCP 1033,ATT. FEES FILED

DECLARATION OF COUNSEL RE: INTEREST,COSTS CCP 1033,ATT. FEES FILED

DECLARATION RE: ISO APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDG FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES,LLC

DECLARATION RE: ISO APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDG FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES,LLC

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON HARRIET WALLACE.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON HARRIET WALLACE.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON HARRIET WALLACE; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/11/17 WITH COSTS OF $59.50 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON HARRIET WALLACE; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/11/17 WITH COSTS OF $59.50 FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

DECLARATION RE: REDUCED FILING FEES BP6322.1(C)(1) FILED.

DECLARATION RE: REDUCED FILING FEES BP6322.1(C)(1) FILED.

COMPLAINT FILED. (LIMITED JURISDICTION - DEC BP6322.1(C)(1)).

COMPLAINT FILED. (LIMITED JURISDICTION - DEC BP6322.1(C)(1)).

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES,LLC FOR ABSTRACT; Minutes; Receipt: 180420-0371 $25.00; 180420-0371-CK Reference Number CK-792140

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • JUDGMENT ON REDUCED COLLECTIONS FILED 09/27/2017 OF PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES,LLC FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON REDUCED COLLECTIONS FILED 09/27/2017 OF PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES,LLC ORDERED ENTERED 03/27/18; JUDGMENT FOR: PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES,LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: HARRIET WALLACE; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $3,841.88 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $255.50 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $4,097.38; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF COUNSEL RE: INTEREST,COSTS CCP 1033,ATT. FEES FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: ISO APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDG FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES,LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON HARRIET WALLACE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON REDUCED COLLECTIONS FILED 09/27/2017 OF PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES,LLC AS TO HARRIET WALLACE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • VACATE OSCSVC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 03/28/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 09/27/2017
  • PLAINTIFF PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES,LLC FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • PRAYED FOR AMOUNT AND/OR DAMAGES IN THE AMOUNT OF $3,841.88

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES,LLC FOR FILING FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 170929-0644 $196.00; 170929-0644-CK Reference Number 735733

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: REDUCED FILING FEES BP6322.1(C)(1) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED. (LIMITED JURISDICTION - DEC BP6322.1(C)(1)).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less