This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 12/21/2021 at 15:00:48 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY -V- STEPHEN NEVAROV

Case Summary

On 02/14/2011 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against STEPHEN NEVAROV. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Needles Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0010

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified

CONV

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

02/07/2012

DocketLegacy Minutes; Comment: OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/07/2012

DocketOSC Re: Status of Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740; Original Type: OSC Re: Status of Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/02/2011

DocketLegacy Minutes; Comment: OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/02/2011

DocketOSC Re: Service Completion Pursuant to CRC 3.740; Original Type: OSC Re: Service Completion Pursuant to CRC 3.740; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/08/2011

DispositionJudgment; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Request for Dismissal; Comment; Comment: (REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/08/2011

DocketRequest for Dismissal Filed; Comment: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE. - STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/01/2011

DocketDeclaration re:; Comment: DECLARATION RE: NON SERVICE FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2011

FinancialCONV; Counter Payment; Receipt # 20110214-1651; ConversionPayment; $240.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2011

FinancialCONV; Transaction Assessment; $240.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2011

FinancialCONV; Total Financial Assessment: $240.00; Total Payments and Credits: $240.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2011

DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: FILING FEE PAID BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES LLC FOR COMPLAINT (FIRST PAPER) 110214-1651-CK CLS/ 240.00 PAYMT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2011

DocketParties Referred to Alternate Dispute Resolution; Comment: PARTIES REFERRED TO ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2011

DocketCertificate of Assignment Received; Comment: CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2011

DocketCase Assigned for All Purposes; Comment: CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT N1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2011

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed; Comment: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2011

DocketSummons Issued and Filed; Comment: SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2011

DocketCase and Party Information added; Comment: CASE AND PARTY INFORMATION ADDED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less