This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 07:15:53 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY -V- PACHECO

Case Summary

On 09/27/2017 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY -V- PACHECO was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9095

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES,LLC

Defendant

DENISSE PACHECO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HUNT & HENRIQUES, ATTORNEYS ATLAW

151 Bernal Rd. Suite 8

San Jose, CA 95119

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON DENISSE PACHECO.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON DENISSE PACHECO.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

DECLARATION RE: INTEREST/CCP 1033/ATTORNEY FEES FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES,LLC

DECLARATION RE: INTEREST/CCP 1033/ATTORNEY FEES FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES,LLC

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

DECLARATION RE: REDUCED FILING FEES BP6322.1(C)(1) FILED.

DECLARATION RE: REDUCED FILING FEES BP6322.1(C)(1) FILED.

JUDGMENT ON REDUCED COLLECTIONS FILED 09/27/2017 OF PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES,LLC FILED

JUDGMENT ON REDUCED COLLECTIONS FILED 09/27/2017 OF PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES,LLC FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON REDUCED COLLECTIONS FILED 09/27/2017 OF PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES,LLC ORDERED ENTERED 03/12/18; JUDGMENT FOR: PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES,LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: DENISSE PACHECO; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $4,135.18 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $255.50 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $4,390.68; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

COMPLAINT FILED. (LIMITED JURISDICTION - DEC BP6322.1(C)(1)).

COMPLAINT FILED. (LIMITED JURISDICTION - DEC BP6322.1(C)(1)).

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

DECLARATION RE: IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUD FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES,LLC

DECLARATION RE: IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUD FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES,LLC

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON DENISSE PACHECO; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/28/17 WITH COSTS OF $59.50 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON DENISSE PACHECO; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/28/17 WITH COSTS OF $59.50 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO DENISSE PACHECO WITH COSTS OF $59.50

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO DENISSE PACHECO WITH COSTS OF $59.50

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES,LLC FOR ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 180403-0234 $25.00; 180403-0234-CK Reference Number 787483

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT ON REDUCED COLLECTIONS FILED 09/27/2017 OF PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES,LLC FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON REDUCED COLLECTIONS FILED 09/27/2017 OF PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES,LLC ORDERED ENTERED 03/12/18; JUDGMENT FOR: PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES,LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: DENISSE PACHECO; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $4,135.18 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $255.50 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $4,390.68; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: INTEREST/CCP 1033/ATTORNEY FEES FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES,LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON DENISSE PACHECO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON REDUCED COLLECTIONS FILED 09/27/2017 OF PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES,LLC AS TO DENISSE PACHECO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUD FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES,LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • VACATE OSCSVC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 03/28/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 09/27/2017
  • PLAINTIFF PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES,LLC FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • PRAYED FOR AMOUNT AND/OR DAMAGES IN THE AMOUNT OF $4,135.18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: REDUCED FILING FEES BP6322.1(C)(1) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES,LLC FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 170928-0796 $196.00; 170928-0796-CK Reference Number 735720

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED. (LIMITED JURISDICTION - DEC BP6322.1(C)(1)).

    Read MoreRead Less