This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 06:02:04 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY -V- GODOWN

Case Summary

On 09/21/2017 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GODOWN. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8625

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES,LLC

Defendant

JASON GODOWN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HUNT & HENRIQUES

151 Bernal Rd Suite 8

San Jose, CA 95119

Defendant Attorney

MOLLOY, CURTIS

42 Shepherd Center 2401 Northwest Twenty-Third St

Oklahoma City, OK 73107

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES,LLC.

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES,LLC.

NOTICE OF RULING ON DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF THE ENTIRE ACTION FILED.

NOTICE OF RULING ON DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF THE ENTIRE ACTION FILED.

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS PLTF & DEF FTA 013018/TSC; Disposition: Pre-D Complete

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS PLTF & DEF FTA 013018/TSC; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MICHAEL M DEST, JUDGE; CLERK: JENNIFER MEDINA; NOT REPORTED; COURT ATTENDANT C MIRAGLIA; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY LOUIS SAMPSON PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; HUNT & HENRIQUES FOR JASON GODOWN NOT PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:46; COURT ADDRESSES ISSUE REGARDING SANCTIONS.; THE COURT IMPOSES SANCTIONS ON PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL(FTA ON 01/30/18) IN THE AMOUNT OF $ $90.00 PAYABLE TO SUPERIOR COURT ON OR BEFORE 04/02/18.; THE COURT IMPOSES SANCTIONS ON DEFENDANTS COUNSEL(FTA ON 01/30/18) IN THE AMOUNT OF $ $90.00 PAYABLE TO SUPERIOR COURT ON OR BEFORE 04/02/18.; TRIAL REQUESTED.; JURY WAIVED; CASE TO PROCEED AS TO NON-JURY TRIAL.; TRIAL ESTIMATE IS 2 HOURS; TRIAL SETTING ORDERS ISSUED.; BENCH TRIAL: ORDER: EACH SIDE IS ORDERED TO FILE WITH THE COURT AND EXCHANGE WITH OPPOSING; PARTIES, THE FOLLOWING: [1] TRIAL BRIEF, [2] WITNESS LIST, AND [3] EXHIBIT LIST, PROPERLY; PAGE-NUMBERED, TABBED AND INDEXED, PURSUANT TO PARAGRAPHS (C )(F) OF CRC 3.1110, 10 DAYS PRIOR; TO TRIAL. ANY CCP 98 DECLARATION MUST BE SERVED AT LEAST 30 DAYS PRIOR TO TRIAL AND IN; COMPLIANCE WITH THAT STATUE. VIOLATION OF THIS ORDER MAY RESULT IN MONETARY SANCTIONS,; EXCLUSION OF EVIDENCE AND/OR WITNESSES.; HEARINGS:; COURT TRIAL ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/21/2017 OF PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES,LLC IS SET FOR 07/13/18 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT S17; COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE; 08:49; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

DECLARATION OF CATHERINE FONG FILED

DECLARATION OF CATHERINE FONG FILED

TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete

TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MICHAEL M DEST, JUDGE; CLERK: ARLENE GUARDADO; COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER NONE; COURT ATTENDANT C MIRAGLIA; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:45; THERE BEING NO APPEARANCE BY PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL, THE COURT ORDERS THIS MATTER SET FOR:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING WHY $90.00 SANCTIONS FOR PLAINTIFF AND DEFENSE COUNSEL; FAILURE TO APPEAR SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED.; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : SANCTIONS PLTF & DEF FTA 013018/TSC SET FOR 03/01/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL 01/30/18 MINUTE ORDER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE; 08:45; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES,LLC.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES,LLC.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

GENERAL DENIAL FILED BY JASON GODOWN; REPRESENTED BY ATTORNEY CURTIS MOLLOY.

GENERAL DENIAL FILED BY JASON GODOWN; REPRESENTED BY ATTORNEY CURTIS MOLLOY.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON JASON GODOWN; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/08/17 WITH COSTS OF $59.50 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON JASON GODOWN; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/08/17 WITH COSTS OF $59.50 FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED; Minutes; Receipt: 170925-0458 $240.00; 170925-0458-CK Reference Number 735707

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2020
  • OSC RE: DISMISSAL; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • COURT TRIAL SET FOR COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/21/2017 OF PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES,LLC; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • RETURN TO COURT'S CONTROL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • REQUEST RE: DISMISSAL OF COMPLAINT WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • ORDER ON SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT FILED; Minutes; ON COURTS MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: SIGNED STIPULATED SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT FILED.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT JURISDICTION RETAINED UNDER C CP 664.6 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES,LLC FOR STIP/ORDER; Minutes; Receipt: 180605-0065 $20.00; 180605-0065-CK Reference Number 806518

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • MATTER STAYED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES,LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 11/30/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY JASON GODOWN FOR FAX FILING; Minutes; Receipt: 171201-0081 $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY JASON GODOWN FOR FIRST APPEARANE; Minutes; Receipt: 171201-0082 $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • GENERAL DENIAL FILED BY JASON GODOWN; REPRESENTED BY ATTORNEY CURTIS MOLLOY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • VACATE OSCSVC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 03/26/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON JASON GODOWN; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/08/17 WITH COSTS OF $59.50 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED; Minutes; Receipt: 170925-0458 $240.00; 170925-0458-CK Reference Number 735707

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.