This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/10/2018 at 05:24:19 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY -V- EDISON COLON

Case Summary

On 12/14/2016 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against EDISON COLON. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1462

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES,LLC

Defendant

EDISON COLON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HUNT & HENRIQUES

151 Bernal Rd Suite 8

San Jose, CA 95119

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO EDISON COLON WITH COSTS OF $59.50

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO EDISON COLON WITH COSTS OF $59.50

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO EDISON COLON WITH COSTS OF $57.50

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO EDISON COLON WITH COSTS OF $57.50

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2017
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO EDISON COLON WITH COSTS OF $59.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO EDISON COLON WITH COSTS OF $57.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES,LLC FOR FIRST PAPER FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 161219-0156 $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.