This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 09:48:12 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY -V- COLLEEN T GALINDO

Case Summary

On 10/12/2017 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against COLLEEN T GALINDO. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9995

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES,LLC

Defendant

COLLEEN T GALINDO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HUNT & HENRIQUES

151 Bernal Rd Suite 8

San Jose, CA 95119

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT ON REDUCED COLLECTIONS FILED 10/12/2017 OF PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES,LLC FILED

JUDGMENT ON REDUCED COLLECTIONS FILED 10/12/2017 OF PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES,LLC FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON REDUCED COLLECTIONS FILED 10/12/2017 OF PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES,LLC ORDERED ENTERED 03/16/18; JUDGMENT FOR: PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES,LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: COLLEEN T GALINDO; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $3,343.72 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $255.50 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $3,599.22; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

DECLARATION RE: INTEREST/ CCP 1033/ ATTY FEES FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES,LLC

DECLARATION RE: INTEREST/ CCP 1033/ ATTY FEES FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES,LLC

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON COLLEEN T GALINDO.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON COLLEEN T GALINDO.

DECLARATION RE: IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUD FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES,LLC

DECLARATION RE: IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUD FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES,LLC

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON COLLEEN T GALINDO; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/26/17 WITH COSTS OF $59.50 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON COLLEEN T GALINDO; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/26/17 WITH COSTS OF $59.50 FILED.

DECLARATION RE: REDUCED FILING FEES BP6322.1(C)(1) FILED.

DECLARATION RE: REDUCED FILING FEES BP6322.1(C)(1) FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

COMPLAINT FILED. (LIMITED JURISDICTION - DEC BP6322.1(C)(1)).

COMPLAINT FILED. (LIMITED JURISDICTION - DEC BP6322.1(C)(1)).

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED; Minutes; Receipt: 180416-0906 $25.00; 180416-0906-CK Reference Number CK#788164

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT ON REDUCED COLLECTIONS FILED 10/12/2017 OF PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES,LLC FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON REDUCED COLLECTIONS FILED 10/12/2017 OF PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES,LLC ORDERED ENTERED 03/16/18; JUDGMENT FOR: PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES,LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: COLLEEN T GALINDO; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $3,343.72 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $255.50 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $3,599.22; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: INTEREST/ CCP 1033/ ATTY FEES FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES,LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON COLLEEN T GALINDO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON REDUCED COLLECTIONS FILED 10/12/2017 OF PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES,LLC AS TO COLLEEN T GALINDO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUD FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES,LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • VACATE OSCSVC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 04/12/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON COLLEEN T GALINDO; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/26/17 WITH COSTS OF $59.50 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: REDUCED FILING FEES BP6322.1(C)(1) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • PLAINTIFF PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES,LLC FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • PRAYED FOR AMOUNT AND/OR DAMAGES IN THE AMOUNT OF $3,343.72

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES,LLC FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 171013-0062 $196.00; 171013-0062-CK Reference Number 742883

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED. (LIMITED JURISDICTION - DEC BP6322.1(C)(1)).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.