This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/10/2021 at 19:44:41 (UTC).

POLANCO-V-FIRST STEP

Case Summary

On 04/03/2017 POLANCO-V-FIRST STEP was filed as a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Cohn, David, Frangie, Janet M, Reilly, Tara and Stanford, Reichert. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6091

  • Filing Date:

    04/03/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judges

Cohn, David

Frangie, Janet M

Reilly, Tara

Stanford, Reichert

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NORMA POLANCO

Defendants and Not Yet Classified

FIRST STEP INDEPENDENT LIVING

NATIONAL MENTOR, LLC, CALIFORNIA MENTOR

MARY VISOR

FIRST STEP INDEPENDENT LIVING PROGRAM, INC.

NATIONAL MENTOR, LLC, NATIONALMENTOR

FIRST STEP INDEPENDENT LIVING PROGRAM, INC

CALIFORNIA MENTOR

CONV

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RIZIO LAW FIRM, PC

2677 North Main Street Suite 225

Santa Ana, CA 92705

Defendant Attorney

SMITH LAW OFFICES,APC

4204 Riverwalk Parkway Suite 250

Riverside, CA 92505

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL BY MAIL

06/15/2020: PROOF OF SERVICE OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL BY MAIL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE. STAGE

06/15/2020: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE. STAGE

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE- OSC RE- DISMISSAL SET FOR

06/09/2020: OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE- OSC RE- DISMISSAL SET FOR

DECLARATION OF RYANEN FILED

06/09/2020: DECLARATION OF RYANEN FILED

NOTICE IMAGED

04/16/2020: NOTICE IMAGED

AMENDED ORDER APPROVING- COMPROMISE OF PENDING ACT

11/21/2019: AMENDED ORDER APPROVING- COMPROMISE OF PENDING ACT

HRG OF 11-21-19 - PROBATE NOTES

11/18/2019: HRG OF 11-21-19 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 11-21-19 - PROBATE NOTES

10/31/2019: HRG OF 11-21-19 - PROBATE NOTES

ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF MINOR'S CLAIM FILED.

10/22/2019: ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF MINOR'S CLAIM FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 11-21-19 PETITION FOR COMPROM

10/10/2019: NOTICE OF HEARING ON 11-21-19 PETITION FOR COMPROM

SUPPLEMENTAL PETITION FILED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITE

10/07/2019: SUPPLEMENTAL PETITION FILED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITE

STIPULATION AND ORDER RE- APPOINTMENT OF JUDGE PRO

10/01/2019: STIPULATION AND ORDER RE- APPOINTMENT OF JUDGE PRO

HRG OF 10-01-19 - PROBATE NOTES

09/27/2019: HRG OF 10-01-19 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 10-01-19 - PROBATE NOTES

09/25/2019: HRG OF 10-01-19 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 10-01-19 - PROBATE NOTES

09/17/2019: HRG OF 10-01-19 - PROBATE NOTES

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE- OSC- DISMISSAL & SANCTION

08/28/2019: OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE- OSC- DISMISSAL & SANCTION

NOTICE OF RULING ON OSC RE- DISMISSAL-SETTLEMENT A

07/15/2019: NOTICE OF RULING ON OSC RE- DISMISSAL-SETTLEMENT A

HRG OF 07-02-19 - PROBATE NOTES

06/26/2019: HRG OF 07-02-19 - PROBATE NOTES

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketLegacy Minutes; Comment: OSC RE: DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal; Original Type: Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: OSC RE: DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DispositionJudgment; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Request for Dismissal; Comment; Comment: (REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketService type not specified; Anticipated Server; Anticipated Method; Served: 06/15/2020; Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL BY MAIL ON 06/15/20 AS TO SEE SERVICE LIST, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Filed; Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL BY MAIL ON 06/15/20 AS TO SEE SERVICE LIST, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal Filed; Comment: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE. STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOpposition to Motion Filed; Comment: OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: OSC RE: DISMISSAL SET FOR HEARING ON 06/17/20, FILED BY PLAINTIFF NORMA POLANCO (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Filed; Comment: DECLARATION OF RYANEN FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • DocketLegacy Minutes; Comment: OSC RE: DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal; Original Type: Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal; Hearing Time: 09:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: OSC RE: DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
91 More Docket Entries
  • 04/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Imaged; Comment: NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • FinancialCONV; Counter Payment; Receipt # 20170403-1036; ConversionPayment; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • FinancialCONV; Transaction Assessment; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • FinancialCONV; Total Financial Assessment: $1,894.00; Total Payments and Credits: $1,894.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: FILING FEE PAID BY NORMA POLANCO FOR FIRST APPEARANCE 170403-1036-CK CVH/ 435.00 PAYMT 170403-1036-CK REFERENCE NUMBER CK 387256

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • DocketCase Assigned for All Purposes; Comment: CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed; Comment: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • DocketNo Summons Issued; Comment: NO SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint and Party Information Entered; Comment: COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Assignment Received; Comment: CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FIRST STEP INDEPENDENT LIVING PROGRAM INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where CONV is a litigant

Latest cases where National Mentor Holdings, Inc. doing business as The Mentor Network doing business as Florida Mentor is a litigant

Latest cases where California Mentor is a litigant