Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 06/07/2018 at 15:17:17 (UTC).

PIRVU-V-KIRSCHMANN, ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/23/2011 PIRVU-V-KIRSCHMANN was filed as a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Joshua Tree District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0446

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Joshua Tree District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EMILIANA PIRVU

Defendants

YUCCA VALLEY DEVELOPMENT DEPARTMENT

ROBERT KIRSCHMANN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2012
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; FRANK GAFKOWSKI, JUDGE; CLERK: ROSALIE MENDOZA; COURT REPORTER JENNIFER BOROS 13355; BAILIFF: J COX; APPEARANCES:; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: EMILIANA PIRVU, ROBERT KIRSCHMANN, YUCCA VALLEY DEVELOPMENT DEPARTMENT; PROCEEDINGS:; CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HELD.; ON COURT MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: NO ACTIVITY FOR ONE YEAR/NO APPEARANCE TODAY.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - LACK OF PROSECUTION BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - LACK OF PROSCECUTION BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2012
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; FRANK GAFKOWSKI, JUDGE; CLERK: ROBIN RYAN; COURT REPORTER GARY RAGLE 9848; BAILIFF: J COX; APPEARANCES:; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: EMILIANA PIRVU, ROBERT KIRSCHMANN, YUCCA VALLEY DEVELOPMENT DEPARTMENT; PROCEEDINGS:; CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HELD.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 12/04/12 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT M4.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2012
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; FRANK GAFKOWSKI, JUDGE; CLERK: ROSALIE MENDOZA; COURT REPORTER DEANA ASSAD 13309; BAILIFF: J COX; APPEARANCES:; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: EMILIANA PIRVU, ROBERT KIRSCHMANN, YUCCA VALLEY DEVELOPMENT DEPARTMENT; PROCEEDINGS:; CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HELD.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 10/02/12 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT M4.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2012
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; FRANK GAFKOWSKI, JUDGE; CLERK: ROSALIE MENDOZA; COURT REPORTER JENNIFER BARNAKIAN POLAND 13317; BAILIFF: K DOUGAN; APPEARANCES:; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: EMILIANA PIRVU, ROBERT KIRSCHMANN, YUCCA VALLEY DEVELOPMENT DEPARTMENT; PROCEEDINGS:; CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HELD.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 07/03/12 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT M4.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2012
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; FRANK GAFKOWSKI, JUDGE; CLERK: ROBIN RYAN; COURT REPORTER JENNIFER BARNAKIAN POLAND 13317; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HELD.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 05/01/12 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT M4.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2011
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; FRANK GAFKOWSKI, JUDGE; CLERK: ROSALIE MENDOZA; COURT REPORTER JENNIFER BARNAKIAN POLAND 13317; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HELD.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 01/31/12 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT M4.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2011
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 111110-3162 $14.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2011
  • ** VOID ** BLANK FEE TO FEE WINDOW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2011
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 111110-3129 $14.50; 111110-3129-DB Reference Number 023-0096242937

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2011
  • LETTER/RFA SENT TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2011
  • REQUEST FOR FURTHER ACTION/COURT ORDER RE: PROOFS OF SERVICE SENT DEPARTMENT M4 FOR REVIEW.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY YUCCA VALLEY DEVELOPMENT DEPARTMENT (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY ROBERT KIRICHMANN (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2011
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2011
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2011
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2011
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT M4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2011
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 110623-1923 $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2011
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 110623-1932 $11.50

    Read MoreRead Less