This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/07/2018 at 17:44:03 (UTC).

PIRIS -V- MENDIOLA

Case Summary

On 03/09/2017 PIRIS filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MENDIOLA. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1568

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JORGE PIRIS

Defendant

LIZBETH A MENDIOLA

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION RE: UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED.

STIPULATION RE: UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED.

COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 00:50 HOURS.

REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 00:50 HOURS.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON LIZBETH A MENDIOLA; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 03/09/17

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON LIZBETH A MENDIOLA; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 03/09/17

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ANSWER FILED BY LIZBETH A MENDIOLA; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

ANSWER FILED BY LIZBETH A MENDIOLA; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

ANSWER FILED BY LIZBETH A MENDIOLA; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

ANSWER FILED BY LIZBETH A MENDIOLA; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170309-0028 $255.00; 170309-0028-CK Reference Number 819

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2018
  • UNDELIVERED: NOTICE OF FILING OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER ACTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION RE: UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 00:50 HRS.; Disposition: Stipulated Judgment Before Trial; Minutes; DAVID A WILLIAMS, JUDGE; CLERK: JERI MILLER; BAILIFF: M PLESCIA; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF JORGE PIRIS PRESENT; DEFENDANT LIZBETH A MENDIOLA PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; PARTIES GO OUT TO MEDIATION; STIPULATION REACHED. SEE STIPULATION ON FILE FOR PARTICULARS.; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 03/09/2017 OF JORGE PIRIS ORDERED ENTERED 04/05/17; JUDGMENT FOR: JORGE PIRIS; JUDGMENT AGAINST: LIZBETH A MENDIOLA; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: LIZBETH A MENDIOLA. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; WRIT TO ISSUE FORTHWITH.; NO LOCK OUT PRIOR TO 04/22/17.; JUDGMENT SIGNED.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY JORGE PIRIS FOR COPIES; Minutes; Receipt: 170320-0824 $1.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 00:50 HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON LIZBETH A MENDIOLA; PARTY SERVED ON 03/09/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY LIZBETH A MENDIOLA IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON LIZBETH A MENDIOLA FOR FIRST APPEARANCE IN THE AMOUNT OF $240.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY LIZBETH A MENDIOLA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER FILED BY LIZBETH A MENDIOLA; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY LIZBETH A MENDIOLA FOR COPIES; Minutes; Receipt: 170310-0586 $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $20.00.--BEGINNING ON 04/01/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT F6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • PAST DUE RENT IS $1,200.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170309-0028 $255.00; 170309-0028-CK Reference Number 819

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.