This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 05/27/2017 at 19:33:03 (UTC).

PIMENTEL -V- SANCHEZ

Case Summary

On 03/07/2017 PIMENTEL filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against SANCHEZ. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0499

  • Filing Date:

    03/07/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Barstow District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FRANCISCO PIMENTEL

Defendant

JOSE L SANCHEZ

 

Court Documents

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( POSSESSION)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( POSSESSION)

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.

SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.

COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 00:25 HRS.; Disposition: Action Dispo: Judgment

COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 00:25 HRS.; Disposition: Action Dispo: Judgment; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 09:05; JAMES R BAXTER, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: AMANDA JAMES; BAILIFF: E. BARELA; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF FRANCISCO PIMENTEL PRESENT; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: JOSE L SANCHEZ; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; PARTIES ADVISED RE:COMMISSIONER/ATTORNEY PRO TEM; NO OBJECTION RAISED. FAILURE TO OBJECT IS DEEMED A STIPULATION TO COMMISSIONER/ATTORNEY PRO TEM SITTING AS JUDGE PRO TEM.; JOSE L SANCHEZ HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; WITNESS -- FRANCISCO PIMENTEL IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; COURT FINDS:; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST JOSE L SANCHEZ.; JUDGMENT FOR: FRANCISCO PIMENTEL; JUDGMENT AGAINST: JOSE L SANCHEZ; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $0.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $255.00 AND DAMAGES $498.44.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $753.44; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: JOSE L SANCHEZ. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; FORFEITURE OF RENTAL/LEASE AGREEMENT; WRIT TO ISSUE FORTHWITH.; JUDGMENT SIGNED.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - COURT FINDING AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - COURT FINDING AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 00:25 HOURS.

REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 00:25 HOURS.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER ANSWER BY MAIL ON 03/14/17 AS TO PLAINTIFF, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER ANSWER BY MAIL ON 03/14/17 AS TO PLAINTIFF, FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ANSWER FILED BY JOSE L SANCHEZ; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

ANSWER FILED BY JOSE L SANCHEZ; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON JOSE L SANCHEZ; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 03/07/17

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON JOSE L SANCHEZ; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 03/07/17

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170307-0645 $255.00

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2027
  • CASE IS DESTROYED PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE 68152 TO 68153 ON 04/07/27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( POSSESSION)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • WRIT FEE OF $25.00 PAID; Minutes; Receipt: 170406-0455 $25.00; 170406-0455-DB Reference Number 026-0024011238

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 00:25 HRS.; Disposition: Action Dispo: Judgment; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 09:05; JAMES R BAXTER, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: AMANDA JAMES; BAILIFF: E. BARELA; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF FRANCISCO PIMENTEL PRESENT; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: JOSE L SANCHEZ; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; PARTIES ADVISED RE:COMMISSIONER/ATTORNEY PRO TEM; NO OBJECTION RAISED. FAILURE TO OBJECT IS DEEMED A STIPULATION TO COMMISSIONER/ATTORNEY PRO TEM SITTING AS JUDGE PRO TEM.; JOSE L SANCHEZ HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; WITNESS -- FRANCISCO PIMENTEL IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; COURT FINDS:; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST JOSE L SANCHEZ.; JUDGMENT FOR: FRANCISCO PIMENTEL; JUDGMENT AGAINST: JOSE L SANCHEZ; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $0.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $255.00 AND DAMAGES $498.44.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $753.44; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: JOSE L SANCHEZ. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; FORFEITURE OF RENTAL/LEASE AGREEMENT; WRIT TO ISSUE FORTHWITH.; JUDGMENT SIGNED.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - COURT FINDING AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - COURT FINDING AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • RETURN MAIL: NOTICE OF TRIAL(JOSE L SANCHEZ) RECEIVED BACK FROM POST OFFICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 03/14/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY JOSE L SANCHEZ IS GRANTED; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON JOSE L SANCHEZ FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER ANSWER IN THE AMOUNT OF $240.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER FILED BY JOSE L SANCHEZ; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY FRANCISCO PIMENTEL FOR COPIES; Minutes; Receipt: 170314-0230 $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON JOSE L SANCHEZ; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 03/07/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 170307-0655 $7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT B1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170307-0645 $255.00

    Read MoreRead Less