Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 06/07/2018 at 15:13:32 (UTC).

PETITION OF STANLEY WHITE

Case Summary

On 06/20/2011 PETITION OF STANLEY WHITE was filed as a Civil Right - Firearm Right lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Joshua Tree District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0436

  • Filing Date:

    06/20/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Firearm Right

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Joshua Tree District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Respondent

STANLEY A WHITE

Other

THE DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

DISTRICT ATTORNEY - JOSHUA TREE

6527 White Feather Road

Joshua Tree, CA 92252

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2012
  • DISPOSITION CASE; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: PETITION GRANTED; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION --OTHER JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL.; DISPOSITION: PETITION GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2011
  • FILING FEE PAID BY STANLEY A WHITE FOR COPY; Minutes; Receipt: 110916-3169 $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2011
  • FILING FEE PAID BY STANLEY A WHITE FOR CERTIFED COPY; Minutes; Receipt: 110916-3167 $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2011
  • HEARING ON PETITION FOR RELIEF OF FIREARM PROHIBITION PURSUANT TO W&I 8103; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; JAMES J. HOSKING, JUDGE; CLERK: KIMBERLEY HANNA; COURT REPORTER GARY RAGLE 9848; PLAINTIFF THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA PRESENT; (SIMON UMSCHEID PRESENT); DEFENDANT STANLEY A WHITE PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; WITNESS -- STANLEY WHITE IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; CLOSED HEARING - DEFENDANT CHOOSES TO HAVE HIS; WIFE PRESENT IN THE COURTROOM FOR THIS HEARING.; COURT FINDS STANLEY WHITE SHALL NOT BE SUBJECT TO THE FIVE YEAR PROHIBITION PURSUANT TO WELFARE AND; INSTITUTIONS CODE 8103.; COURT ORDERS THE JUDICIAL ASSISTANT TO SUBMIT THE ORDER TO THE DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF MINUTE ORDER DATED 09-13-11 (TO DOJ) TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; I CERTIFY THAT A COPY OF THIS MINUTE ORDER WAS MAILED TO DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ON 09/13/11.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2011
  • DECLARATION OF STANLEY A. WHITE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF STANLEY A. WHITE BY MAILING ON 09/06/11 AS TO DISTRICT ATTORNEYS OFFICE, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2011
  • DEPOSIT AND DISBURSEMENT ORDER FILED. CONFIDENTIAL REPORT FROM DOJ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2011
  • HEARING ON PETITION FOR RELIEF OF FIREARM PROHIBITION PURSUANT TO W&I 8103; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; FRANK GAFKOWSKI, JUDGE; CLERK: ROSALIE MENDOZA; COURT REPORTER CONNIE OZBURN 10031; ATTORNEY SIMON UMSCHEID PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; DEFENDANT STANLEY A WHITE PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; HEARING BRIEF RECEIVED FROM STANLEY WHITE AND COPY SERVED ON DISTRICT ATTORNEY IN OPEN COURT.; DISTRICT ATTORNEY REQUESTED A CONTINUANCE TO REVIEW THE MATTER. COURT FINDS THAT IT WOULD BE; APPROPRIATE FOR JUDGE HOSKING TO HEAR THIS PETITION.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 09/13/11 AT 09:00 IN DEPARTMENT M3.; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2011
  • NOTICE MAILED TO DOJ AND CANYON RIDGE HOSPITAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2011
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2011
  • MENTAL HEALTH CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2011
  • NOTICE OF HRNG ON PETITION FOR RELIEF OF FIREARM HEARING SET: 07/13/11 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. M4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2011
  • REQUEST FOR HEARING FOR RELIEF FROM FIREARMS PROH CODE(WIC) SECTION 8103(F)(1) (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Department of Justice is a litigant