This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 13:16:25 (UTC).

PETERSON-V-FCA US LLC

Case Summary

On 10/30/2017 PETERSON-V-FCA US LLC was filed as a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1431

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SCOTT PETERSON

Defendant

FCA US LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THE BICKEL LAW FIRM INC

Defendant Attorney

GATES, O'DOHERTY, GONTER & GUY

38 Discovery Suite 200

Irvine, CA 92618

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON FCA US LLC; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 11/02/17 WITH COSTS OF $39.95 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON FCA US LLC; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 11/02/17 WITH COSTS OF $39.95 FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

ANSWER FILED BY FCA US LLC; PARTY REPRESENTED BY GATES, O'DOHERTY, GONTER & GUY.

ANSWER FILED BY FCA US LLC; PARTY REPRESENTED BY GATES, O'DOHERTY, GONTER & GUY.

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY FCA US LLC

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY FCA US LLC

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • DEFENDANT FCA US LLC FIRST PAPER FEE PAID IN FULL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY FCA US LLC FOR FIRST APP; Minutes; Receipt: 171218-0043 $435.00; 171218-0043-CK Reference Number 392551

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER FILED BY FCA US LLC; PARTY REPRESENTED BY GATES, O'DOHERTY, GONTER & GUY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY FCA US LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON FCA US LLC; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 11/02/17 WITH COSTS OF $39.95 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY SCOTT PETERSON FOR FIRST APPEARANCE; Minutes; Receipt: 171030-0740 $435.00; 171030-0740-CK Reference Number D3580548

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less