This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/09/2018 at 10:24:28 (UTC).

PERSOLVE -V- SCHWARTZ

Case Summary

On 09/08/2016 PERSOLVE filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against SCHWARTZ. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5198

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PERSOLVE, LLC,

9301 Corbin Avenue, Suite 1600

Northridge, CA 91324

Defendant

JILL M SCHWARTZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PERSOLVE, LLC

9301 Corbin Avenue, Suite 1600

Northridge, CA 91324

 

Court Documents

COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT FILED WITH COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $120.00 AND INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,493.12

COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT FILED WITH COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $120.00 AND INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,493.12

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $60.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,788.92)

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $60.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,788.92)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT SERVED ON 03/28/17.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT SERVED ON 03/28/17.

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT RETURNED AND FILED.

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT RETURNED AND FILED.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT SENT.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT SENT.; Minutes; NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IS RETURNED BY THE COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON: CANNOT FILE A; FCOPY OF THE NOTICE IT MUST BE THE ORIGINAL NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT WITH A COPY OF THE; APPLICATION ATTACHED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT SERVED ON 10/24/16.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT SERVED ON 10/24/16.

ORIGINAL CASE WITH JUDGMENT (CIVRS704723) (IMAGED)

ORIGINAL CASE WITH JUDGMENT (CIVRS704723) (IMAGED)

DECLARATION RE: ACCRUED INTEREST FILED BY PERSOLVE, LLC,

DECLARATION RE: ACCRUED INTEREST FILED BY PERSOLVE, LLC,

COPY OF NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT PLACED IN FILE

COPY OF NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT PLACED IN FILE

MEMO OF COSTS FILED BY PERSOLVE, LLC,, FOR 3865.63.

MEMO OF COSTS FILED BY PERSOLVE, LLC,, FOR 3865.63.

RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED.

RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED.; Minutes; ORIGINAL JUDGMENT ENTERED 05/15/08 IS ORDERED RENEWED AS FOLLOWS:; IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED THAT PERSOLVE, LLC, HAVE &; RECOVER FROM JILL M SCHWARTZ:; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $4,673.39 INTEREST $3,865.63 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $30.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $8,569.02; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OTHER CLERK JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OTHER CLERK JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2018
  • WRIT FEE OF $25.00 PAID; Minutes; Receipt: 180629-0747 $25.00; 180629-0747-CK Reference Number 112032

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY ( 10207.14 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT FILED WITH COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $120.00 AND INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,493.12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( $10,442.94 ); Minutes; Receipt: 171020-0501 $25.00; 171020-0501-CK Reference Number 106535

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $60.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,788.92)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SACRAMENTO COUNTY ( IN THE AMOUNT OF 9180.92 ); Minutes; Receipt: 170526-0734 $25.00; 170526-0734-CK Reference Number 103747

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $586.90)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • DECLARATION RE: ACCRUED INTEREST FILED BY PERSOLVE, LLC,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT SERVED ON 03/28/17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT RETURNED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT SENT.; Minutes; NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IS RETURNED BY THE COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON: CANNOT FILE A; FCOPY OF THE NOTICE IT MUST BE THE ORIGINAL NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT WITH A COPY OF THE; APPLICATION ATTACHED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT SERVED ON 10/24/16.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ORIGINAL CASE WITH JUDGMENT (CIVRS704723) (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: ACCRUED INTEREST FILED BY PERSOLVE, LLC,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COPY OF NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT PLACED IN FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMO OF COSTS FILED BY PERSOLVE, LLC,, FOR 3865.63.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED.; Minutes; ORIGINAL JUDGMENT ENTERED 05/15/08 IS ORDERED RENEWED AS FOLLOWS:; IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED THAT PERSOLVE, LLC, HAVE &; RECOVER FROM JILL M SCHWARTZ:; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $4,673.39 INTEREST $3,865.63 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $30.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $8,569.02; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OTHER CLERK JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OTHER CLERK JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2016
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 160914-0335 $30.00; 160914-0335-CK Reference Number 019126

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.