This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 05/19/2019 at 06:09:25 (UTC).

PERFORMANCE AUTO V GRIPPER

Case Summary

On 11/02/2015 PERFORMANCE AUTO filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GRIPPER. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8671

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PERFORMANCE AUTO LOANS, INC.

Defendant

ELDON CARNEILIUS GRIPPER

Assignee

CREDITORS SPECIALTY SERVICE, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Assignee Attorney

CHATFIELD, DAVID BLAKE

32023 Crown Valley Road

Acton, CA 93510

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SOLANO COUNTY ( MAILED IN SASE ) (IMAGED)

WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SOLANO COUNTY ( MAILED IN SASE ) (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 160831-0842 $25.00; 160831-0842-CK Reference Number 12999

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $139.72)

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $139.72)

SUB OF ATTORNEY FOR ASSIGNEE OF RECORD FILED.

SUB OF ATTORNEY FOR ASSIGNEE OF RECORD FILED.

ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FILED 11/02/2015 OF PERFORMANCE AUTO LOANS, INC. FILED ADDING CREDITORS SPECIALTYSERVICE, INC AS THE ASSIGNEE OF THIS JUDGMENT. (IMAGED)

ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FILED 11/02/2015 OF PERFORMANCE AUTO LOANS, INC. FILED ADDING CREDITORS SPECIALTYSERVICE, INC AS THE ASSIGNEE OF THIS JUDGMENT. (IMAGED)

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PERFORMANCE AUTO LOANS, INC. FILED.

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PERFORMANCE AUTO LOANS, INC. FILED.

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING (RESET); Disposition: Complaint Dispoed

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING (RESET); Disposition: Complaint Dispoed; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:36; DONNA CONNALLY, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: JERI MILLER; BAILIFF: D FERRIS; APPEARANCES:; PERFORMANCE AUTO LOANS, INC. REPRESENTED BY ANTHONY BECK.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: ELDON CARNEILIUS GRIPPER; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; ELDON CARNEILIUS GRIPPER HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; COURT TRIAL PROCEEDS.; ANTHONY BECK IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; AND RETURNED; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST ELDON CARNEILIUS GRIPPER.; JUDGMENT FOR: PERFORMANCE AUTO LOANS, INC.; JUDGMENT AGAINST: ELDON CARNEILIUS GRIPPER; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $5,000.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $100.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $5,100.00; 10:38; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC)

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

ORDER ON REQUEST TO POSTPONE TRIAL GRANTED FILED

ORDER ON REQUEST TO POSTPONE TRIAL GRANTED FILED

REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE FILED. (IMAGED)

REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE FILED. (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 151224-0936 $10.00; 151224-0936-CK Reference Number CK 11703

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAS CLAIM FILED AS TO ELDON CARNEILIUS GRIPPER. PARTY SERVED ON 11/20/15. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSERVICE. WITH FEES OF $50.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAS CLAIM FILED AS TO ELDON CARNEILIUS GRIPPER. PARTY SERVED ON 11/20/15. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSERVICE. WITH FEES OF $50.00.

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED; Minutes; Receipt: 151104-3039 $50.00; 151104-3039-CK Reference Number 11311

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SOLANO COUNTY ( MAILED IN SASE ) (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 160831-0842 $25.00; 160831-0842-CK Reference Number 12999

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $139.72)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUB OF ATTORNEY FOR ASSIGNEE OF RECORD FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FILED 11/02/2015 OF PERFORMANCE AUTO LOANS, INC. FILED ADDING CREDITORS SPECIALTYSERVICE, INC AS THE ASSIGNEE OF THIS JUDGMENT. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2016
  • SUB OF ATTY/MEMO OF COST/WRIT OF EXE RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2016
  • ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 03/15/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PERFORMANCE AUTO LOANS, INC. FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING (RESET); Disposition: Complaint Dispoed; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:36; DONNA CONNALLY, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: JERI MILLER; BAILIFF: D FERRIS; APPEARANCES:; PERFORMANCE AUTO LOANS, INC. REPRESENTED BY ANTHONY BECK.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: ELDON CARNEILIUS GRIPPER; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; ELDON CARNEILIUS GRIPPER HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; COURT TRIAL PROCEEDS.; ANTHONY BECK IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; AND RETURNED; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST ELDON CARNEILIUS GRIPPER.; JUDGMENT FOR: PERFORMANCE AUTO LOANS, INC.; JUDGMENT AGAINST: ELDON CARNEILIUS GRIPPER; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $5,000.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $100.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $5,100.00; 10:38; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 12/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON REQUEST TO POSTPONE TRIAL GRANTED FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE FILED. (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 151224-0936 $10.00; 151224-0936-CK Reference Number CK 11703

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2015
  • RQST TO POSTPONE RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2015
  • POS RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAS CLAIM FILED AS TO ELDON CARNEILIUS GRIPPER. PARTY SERVED ON 11/20/15. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSERVICE. WITH FEES OF $50.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2015
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2015
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED; Minutes; Receipt: 151104-3039 $50.00; 151104-3039-CK Reference Number 11311

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2015
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F6

    Read MoreRead Less