This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/10/2018 at 11:05:18 (UTC).

PEREZ -V- SANDOVAL

Case Summary

On 05/04/2011 PEREZ filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against SANDOVAL. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2084

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FRANCISCO CONTRERAS GONZALEZ

SOFIA GUTIERREZ PEREZ

Defendants

MARIA BLANCO SANDOVAL

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILLIAM M GARRETT,JR

463 N. Sierra Way

San Bernardino, CA 92410

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2011
  • DISMISSAL IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): PLAINTIFFS/DEFENDANTS NAME DO NOT MATCH CASE NUMBER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2011
  • DISMISSAL (PER RUNNER) RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2011
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2011
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2011
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2011
  • AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED/FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2011
  • AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED -- AMENDING 1ST AMENDED UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 OF SOFIA PEREZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $26.30.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 110504-2654 $255.00; 110504-2654-CK Reference Number 42280

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S31

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • PAST DUE RENT IS $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less