Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 06/06/2018 at 07:01:53 (UTC).

PEOPLE VS MIGUEL HERNANDEZ

Case Summary

On 04/29/2010 PEOPLE filed an Other lawsuit against MIGUEL HERNANDEZ. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Appeals And Appellate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0052

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Appeals And Appellate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Appellant

MIGUEL HERNANDEZ

Respondent

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

, MAE ALBERTO

5777 W. Century Blvd. #750

Los Angeles, CA 90045

Respondent Attorney

DISTRICT ATTORNEY

14455 Civic Dr.

Victorville, CA 92392

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2011
  • ATTORNEY BILLING FORWARDED FOR PROCESSING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2011
  • REMITTITUR ISSUED. DECISION: PER CURIUM OPINION FILED ON 03/30/11.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2011
  • STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ALL OTHER JUDGMENTS BEFORE TRIAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2011
  • CASE STATUS SET TO CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2011
  • JUDGMENT WITH OPINION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2011
  • APPEAL JUDGMENT IS AFFIRMED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2011
  • HEARING ON APPEAL; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; DAVID COHN, JUDGE; JOSEPH R. BRISCO, JUDGE; WILLIAM JEFFERSON POWELL, JUDGE; CLERK: CYNTHIA GOMEZ; COURT REPORTER TRACI TROLI 13302; COURT ATTENDANT A CERVANTES; BAILIFF: ANTHONY CIMINO; DEPUTY DA JASON WILKINSON PRESENT.; ACTION CAME ON FOR HEARING ON APPEAL; FOLLOWING ORAL ARGUMENT BY JASON WILKINSON DDA, COURT TAKES CASE UNDER SUBMISSION.; THE JUDGMENT IS AFFIRMED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2010
  • CASE PREPARED FOR MARCH CALENDAR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2010
  • APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF DUE 12/09/10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2010
  • RESPONDENT'S BRIEF FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/19/2010
  • REQUEST FOR ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE OF RB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2010
  • RESPONDENTS BRIEF DUE 10/20/10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2010
  • APPELLANTS OPENING BRIEF FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2010
  • APPELLANTS OPENING BRIEF DUE 9/17/10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2010
  • NOTICE OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2010
  • RECORD ON APPEAL FILED - CT 1 VOL / RT 2 VOLS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2010
  • APPEAL ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2010
  • ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL (MAE ALBERTO) FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2010
  • MAILED PACKET TO ATTY ALBERTO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2010
  • SUPERIOR COURT CASE #TVI902487 - VICTORVILLE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer , MAE ALBERTO