This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 06/06/2018 at 06:07:35 (UTC).

PEOPLE VS MICHAEL R MANOLESCU

Case Summary

On 04/13/2009 PEOPLE filed an Infraction - Other Infraction lawsuit against MICHAEL R MANOLESCU. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Appeals and Appellate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0041

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Infraction - Other Infraction

 

Party Details

Appellant

MICHAEL R MANOLESCU

Respondent

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

DISTRICT ATTORNEY

303 W Third St. Fifth Floor

San Bernardino, CA 92415-0511

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2009
  • DocketRECEIVED COPY OF PETITION TO REVIEW SUBMITTED TO SUPREME COURT BY APPELLANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2009
  • DocketRECEIVED DCA ORDER - PETITION TO TRANSFER CASE WAS UNTIMELY.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2009
  • DocketSTAGE AT DISPOSITION: ALL OTHER JUDGMENTS BEFORE TRIAL.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2009
  • DocketCASE STATUS SET TO CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2009
  • DocketREMITTITUR ISSUED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2009
  • DocketREQUEST FOR CERTIFICATION TO HIGHER COURT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2009
  • DocketORDER DENYING TRANSFER/CERTIFICATION TO COURT OF APPEAL FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2009
  • DocketREQUEST FOR CERTIFICATION TO COURT OF APPEAL FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2009
  • DocketJUDGMENT WITHOUT OPINION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2009
  • DocketAPPEAL AFFIRMED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2009
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING ON APPEAL FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2009
  • DocketAPPELLATE HEARING AUGUST 28, 2009 S-35

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2009
  • DocketCASE PREPPED FOR AUGUST APPELLATE CALENDAR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2009
  • DocketAPPELLANTS OPENING BRIEF FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2009
  • DocketNOTICE OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2009
  • DocketAPPELLANTS OPENING BRIEF DUE 5/14/09

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2009
  • DocketAPPEAL RECORD FILED CT-1 VOL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2009
  • DocketAPPEAL ENTERED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2009
  • DocketSUPERIOR COURT # 03418JPMM - VICTORVILLE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less