This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 06/06/2018 at 06:14:48 (UTC).

PEOPLE VS MICHAEL BADA

Case Summary

On 05/26/2009 PEOPLE filed an Other lawsuit against MICHAEL BADA. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Appeals and Appellate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0068

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Appellant

MICHAEL BADA

Respondent

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF ESPERANZA V. BADA

1240 N. Hacienda Blvd., Suite 106

La Puente, CA 91744-1663

Respondent Attorney

DISTRICT ATTORNEY RANCHO CUCAMONGA

8303 N Haven Avenue 4Th Floor

Rancho Cucamonga, CA 91730

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2011
  • DocketCASE SENT TO STORAGE BOX #193

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2010
  • DocketRETURN MAIL: REMITTITUR RECEIVED BACK FROM ESPERANZA BADA.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2010
  • DocketREMITTITUR ISSUED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2010
  • DocketSTAGE AT DISPOSITION: ALL OTHER JUDGMENTS BEFORE TRIAL.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2010
  • DocketCASE STATUS SET TO CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2010
  • DocketJUDGMENT WITH OPINION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2010
  • DocketAPPEAL JUDGMENT AFFIRMED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2010
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER: HEARING ON APPEAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2010
  • DocketNTC OF HEARING ON APPEAL - 8/27/10 S20 @ 1:30 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2010
  • DocketAUGMENTED RECORD ON APPEAL FILED - RT 1 VOLUME

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 09/17/2009
  • DocketORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE OPENING BRIEF FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2009
  • DocketAPPELLANTS OPENING BRIEF DUE 10/19/09

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2009
  • DocketAPPELLANTS APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE OPENING BRIEF FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2009
  • DocketLATE LETTER SENT RE: NO BRIEF FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2009
  • DocketAPPELLANTS OPENING BRIEF DUE 9/18/09

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2009
  • DocketAPPELLANTS OPENING BRIEF DUE 8/14/09

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2009
  • DocketNOTICE OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2009
  • DocketRECORD ON APPEAL FILED CT-1 VOL, RT-1 VOL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2009
  • DocketAPPEAL ENTERED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2009
  • DocketSUPERIOR COURT # MWV 900538 - RANCHO CUC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less