Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 06/06/2018 at 07:05:27 (UTC).

PEOPLE VS MATTHEW MONTAGUE

Case Summary

On 06/02/2010 PEOPLE filed an Other lawsuit against MATTHEW MONTAGUE. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Appeals And Appellate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0078

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Appeals And Appellate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Appellant

MATTHEW MONTAGUE

Respondent

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

PUBLIC DEFENDERS OFFICE

255 North D Street Suite 200

San Bernardino, CA 92415

Respondent Attorney

DISTRICT ATTORNEY

316 N Mt View Ave

San Bernardino, CA 92415

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2011
  • CASE SENT TO STORAGE BOX #202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2011
  • STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ALL OTHER JUDGMENTS BEFORE TRIAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2011
  • CASE STATUS SET TO CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2011
  • REMITTITUR ISSUED. DECISION: PER CURIUM OPINION FILED ON 03/30/11.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2011
  • JUDGMENT WITH OPINION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2011
  • APPEAL JUDGMENT IS AFFIRMED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2011
  • HEARING ON APPEAL; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; DAVID COHN, JUDGE; JOSEPH R. BRISCO, JUDGE; WILLIAM JEFFERSON POWELL, JUDGE; CLERK: CYNTHIA GOMEZ; COURT REPORTER TRACI TROLI 13302; COURT ATTENDANT A CERVANTES; BAILIFF: ANTHONY CIMINO; NO APPEARANCE.; ACTION CAME ON FOR HEARING ON APPEAL; CASE SUBMITTED ON BRIEFS.; THE JUDGMENT IS AFFIRMED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2010
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE OPENING BRIEF FIELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2010
  • CASE PREPARED FOR MARCH CALENDAR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2010
  • RESPONDENT'S BRIEF FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 10/26/2010
  • RESPONDENTS BRIEF DUE 11/27/10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2010
  • RESPONDENTS BRIEF DUE 10/28/10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2010
  • LATE LETTER SENT: NO RESPONDENTS BRIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2010
  • APPELLANTS OPENING BRIEF FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2010
  • RESPONDENTS BRIEF DUE 8/5/10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2010
  • NOTICE OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2010
  • APPELLANTS OPENIGN BRIEF DUE 7/6/10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2010
  • APPEAL ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2010
  • SUPERIOR COURT # TSB 902534 - SAN BERNS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2010
  • RECORD ON APPEAL FILED CT-1 VOL, RT-1 VOL

    Read MoreRead Less