This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 06/06/2018 at 06:31:52 (UTC).

PEOPLE VS MARIA MIRALDA

Case Summary

On 11/05/2009 PEOPLE filed an Other lawsuit against MARIA MIRALDA. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Appeals and Appellate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0163

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Appellant

MARIA MIRALDA

Respondent

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

LUGO, ALEJO

3333 Central Avenue Suite G

Riverside, CA 92506

Respondent Attorney

DISTRICT ATTORNEY

316 N Mt View Ave

San Bernardino, CA 92415

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2011
  • DocketREMITTITUR ISSUED. DECISION: PER CURIUM OPINION FILED ON 11/19/10.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2011
  • DocketSTAGE AT DISPOSITION: ALL OTHER JUDGMENTS BEFORE TRIAL.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2011
  • DocketCASE STATUS SET TO CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2010
  • DocketJUDGMENT WITH OPINION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2010
  • DocketAPPEAL JUDGEMTN IS AFFIRMED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2010
  • DocketNTC OF HEARING ON APPEAL - 11/5/10 1:30 PM S-20

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2010
  • DocketCASE PREPD FOR OCTOBER CALENDAR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2010
  • DocketREPLY BRIEF DUE 8/3/10

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2010
  • DocketAUGMENTED RECORD ON APPEAL FILED -CT 1 VOLUME

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2010
  • DocketUPDATE FIRM ADDRESS OF ALEJO LUGO, ATTORNEY FOR MARIA MIRALDA.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 01/27/2010
  • DocketNO REPLY BRIEF FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2010
  • DocketCASE PREPPED FOR JUNE APPELLATE CALENDAR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2010
  • DocketRESPONDENTS BRIEF FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2010
  • DocketAPPELLANTS REPLY BRIEF DUE 1/26/10

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2009
  • DocketAPPELLANTS OPENING BRIEF FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2009
  • DocketRESPONDENTS BRIEF DUE 1/7/10

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2009
  • DocketAPPELLANTS OPENING BRIEF DUE 12/7/09

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2009
  • DocketNOTICE OF BRIEFIGN SCHEDULE FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2009
  • DocketAPPEAL ENTERED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2009
  • DocketSUPERIOR COURT # MSB 902858 - SAN BERN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less