This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 06/06/2018 at 07:04:42 (UTC).

PEOPLE VS LIANNA SANTOS

Case Summary

On 05/24/2010 PEOPLE filed an Other lawsuit against LIANNA SANTOS. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Appeals and Appellate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0070

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Appellant

LIANNA SANTOS

Respondent

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

KAMIONSKI, MURRAY

1334 Parkview Ave #100

Redondo Beach, CA 90266

Respondent Attorney

DISTRICT ATTORNEY

316 N Mt View Ave

San Bernardino, CA 92415

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2012
  • DocketCASE SENT TO RECORDS CENTER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2011
  • DocketATTY BILLING FORWARDED FOR PROCESSING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2011
  • DocketSTAGE AT DISPOSITION: ALL OTHER JUDGMENTS BEFORE TRIAL.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2011
  • DocketCASE STATUS SET TO CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2011
  • DocketREMITTITUR ISSUED. DECISION: PER CURIUM OPINION FILED ON 08/31/11.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2011
  • DocketJUDGMENT WITH OPINION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2011
  • DocketAPPEAL JUDGMENT IS AFFIRMED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2011
  • DocketHEARING ON APPEAL; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; JOSEPH R. BRISCO, JUDGE; JOHN M PACHECO, JUDGE; WILLIAM JEFFERSON POWELL, JUDGE; CLERK: CYNTHIA GOMEZ; COURT REPORTER CYNTHIA GARCIA 12152; COURT ATTENDANT V AMADOR; BAILIFF: R SHARPE; DEPUTY DA MICHAEL STEDMAN PRESENT.; ACTION CAME ON FOR HEARING ON APPEAL.; CASE SUBMITTED ON BRIEFS.; THE JUDGMENT IS AFFIRMED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2011
  • DocketCASE PREPARED FOR AUGUST CALENDAR.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2011
  • DocketRESPONDENT'S BRIEF FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 01/03/2011
  • DocketREQUEST FOR EXTENSION TO FILE RESPONDENTS BRIEF FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2010
  • DocketAPPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2010
  • DocketRESPONDENT'S BRIEF DUE 01/05/11

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2010
  • DocketAPPELLANTS OPENING BRIEF DUE 12/4/10

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2010
  • DocketNTC OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2010
  • DocketRECORD ON APPEAL FILED - CT 1 VOL / RT 1 VOL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2010
  • DocketPACKET MAILED TO ATTY KAMIONSKI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2010
  • DocketAPPEAL ENTERED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2010
  • DocketSUPERIOR COURT # MSB 906607 - SAN BERN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2010
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING ATTORNEY (MURRAY KAMIONSKI) FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less