This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 06/06/2018 at 06:54:24 (UTC).

PEOPLE VS LAJAMAAL BRUMFIELD

Case Summary

On 03/15/2010 PEOPLE filed an Infraction - Other Infraction lawsuit against LAJAMAAL BRUMFIELD. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Appeals and Appellate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0036

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Infraction - Other Infraction

 

Party Details

Appellant

LAJAMAAL ELI BRUMFIELD

Respondent

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

DISTRICT ATTORNEY

303 W Third St. Fifth Floor

San Bernardino, CA 92415-0511

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2011
  • DocketREMITTITUR ISSUED. DECISION: APPEAL - JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION AFTER COURT TRIAL FILED ON 11/05/10.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2011
  • DocketSTAGE AT DISPOSITION: ALL OTHER JUDGMENTS BEFORE TRIAL.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2011
  • DocketCASE STATUS SET TO CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2010
  • DocketJUDGMENT WITHOUT OPINION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2010
  • DocketAPPEAL JUDGMENT IS AFFIRMED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2010
  • DocketNTC OF HEARING ON APPEAL - 11/5/10 1:30 PM S-20

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2010
  • DocketCASE PREPPED FOR SEPTEMBER APPELLATE CALENDAR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2010
  • DocketAPPELLANTS OPENING BRIEF FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2010
  • DocketNOTICE OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2010
  • DocketAPPELLANTS OPENING BRIEF DUE 5/13/10

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2010
  • DocketRECORD ON APPEAL FILED CT-1 VOL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2010
  • DocketAPPEAL ENTERED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2010
  • DocketSUPERIOR COURT # V025078BLB - VICTORVILLE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less