This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 06/06/2018 at 06:55:39 (UTC).

PEOPLE VS FREDERICK EBENAL

Case Summary

On 04/13/2010 PEOPLE filed an Infraction - Other Infraction lawsuit against FREDERICK EBENAL. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Appeals and Appellate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0044

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Infraction - Other Infraction

 

Party Details

Appellant

FREDERICK EBENAL

Respondent

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

DISTRICT ATTORNEY

303 W Third St. Fifth Floor

San Bernardino, CA 92415-0511

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2011
  • DocketCASE STATUS SET TO CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2011
  • DocketSTAGE AT DISPOSITION: ALL OTHER JUDGMENTS BEFORE TRIAL.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2011
  • DocketREMITTITUR ISSUED. DECISION: PER CURIUM OPINION FILED ON 12/28/10.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2010
  • DocketJUDGMENT WITH OPINION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2010
  • DocketAPPEAL JUDGMENT IS AFFIRMED IN PART & REVERSED IN PART

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2010
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER: HEARING ON APPEAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2010
  • DocketNTC OF HEARING ON APPEAL 11/19/10 1:30 PM S-20

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2010
  • DocketNO RESPONDENTS BRIEF FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2010
  • DocketCASE PREPD FOR NOVEMBER CALENDAR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2010
  • DocketAPPELLANTS OPENING BRIEF FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2010
  • DocketRESPONDENTS BRIEF DUE 7/14/10

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2010
  • DocketAPPELLANTS OPENING BRIEF DUE 6/16/10

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2010
  • DocketORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE OPENING BRIEF FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2010
  • DocketREQUEST FOR EXTENSION TO FILE BRIEF FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2010
  • DocketAPPELLANTS OPENING BRIEF DUE 5/24/10

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2010
  • DocketNOTICE OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2010
  • DocketUPDATE CASE NAME.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2010
  • DocketRECORD ON APPEAL FILED CT-1 VOL, RT-1 VOL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2010
  • DocketAPPEAL ENTERED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2010
  • DocketSUPERIOR COURT #22793KRFE - JOSHUA TREE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less