Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 06/06/2018 at 06:39:38 (UTC).

PEOPLE VS FON PHAN

Case Summary

On 12/31/2009 PEOPLE filed an Infraction - Other Infraction lawsuit against FON PHAN. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Appeals And Appellate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0201

  • Filing Date:

    12/31/2009

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Infraction - Other Infraction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Appeals And Appellate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Appellant

FON PHAN

Respondent

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

DISTRICT ATTORNEY

303 W Third St. Fifth Floor

San Bernardino, CA 92415-0511

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2010
  • STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ALL OTHER JUDGMENTS BEFORE TRIAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2010
  • CASE STATUS SET TO CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2010
  • REMITTITUR ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2010
  • JUDGMENT WITHOUT OPINION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2010
  • MINUTE ORDER: HEARING ON APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2010
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON APPEAL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2010
  • APPELLATE HEARING 6/18/10 RANCHO R-5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2010
  • CASE PREPPED FOR JUNE APPELLATE CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2010
  • APPELLANTS OPENING BRIEF FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2010
  • NOTICE OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE FILED. APPELLANTS OPENING BRIEF DUE 2/5/10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2009
  • RECORD ON APPEAL FILED CT-1 VOL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2009
  • APPEAL ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2009
  • SUPERIOR COURT # 10178LDFP - FONTANA

    Read MoreRead Less