Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 06/06/2018 at 07:02:28 (UTC).

PEOPLE VS CURTIS CAMERON

Case Summary

On 04/30/2010 PEOPLE filed an Other lawsuit against CURTIS CAMERON. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Appeals And Appellate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0055

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Appeals And Appellate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Appellant

CURTIS CAMERON

Respondent

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

JONES, MARY K

4058 Bledsoe Ave

Los Angeles, CA 90066-5430

Respondent Attorney

DISTRICT ATTORNEY

14455 Civic Dr.

Victorville, CA 92392

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2011
  • CASE SENT TO STORAGE BOX #202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2011
  • REMITTITUR ISSUED. DECISION: PER CURIUM OPINION FILED ON 03/30/11.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2011
  • STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ALL OTHER JUDGMENTS BEFORE TRIAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2011
  • CASE STATUS SET TO CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2011
  • JUDGMENT WITH OPINION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2011
  • APPEAL JUDGMENT IS AFFIRMED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2011
  • HEARING ON APPEAL; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; DAVID COHN, JUDGE; JOSEPH R. BRISCO, JUDGE; WILLIAM JEFFERSON POWELL, JUDGE; CLERK: CYNTHIA GOMEZ; COURT REPORTER TRACI TROLI 13302; COURT ATTENDANT A CERVANTES; BAILIFF: ANTHONY CIMINO; DEPUTY DA MICHELLE ISCANDER PRESENT.; ACTION CAME ON FOR HEARING ON APPEAL; CASE SUBMITTED ON BRIEFS.; THE JUDGMENT IS AFFIRMED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2010
  • RESPONDENT'S BRIEF FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2010
  • APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF DUE 01/07/11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2010
  • LATE LETTER SENT: NO RESPONDENTS BRIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 08/31/2010
  • APPELLANTS OPENING BRIEF DUE 9/28/10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2010
  • APPELLANTS REQUEST FOR ADDITIONAL EXTENSION TO FILE OPENING BRIEF FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2010
  • LATE LETTER SENT: NO OPENING BRIEF FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2010
  • APPELLANTS OPENING BRIEF DUE 8/29/10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2010
  • NOTICE OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE FILED - APPELLANTS OPENING BRIEF DUE 7/14/10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2010
  • RECORD ON APPEAL FILED - (CT/1 VOL RT/1 VOL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2010
  • APPEAL ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2010
  • ORDER APPOINTING ATTORNEY (MARY JONES) FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2010
  • MAILED PACKET TO ATTY JONES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2010
  • SUPERIOR COURT CASE #MVI051592 - VICTORVILLE

    Read MoreRead Less