Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 06/06/2018 at 06:32:57 (UTC).

PEOPLE VS CHRISTOPHER NEWCOMBE

Case Summary

On 12/10/2009 PEOPLE filed an Infraction - Other Infraction lawsuit against CHRISTOPHER NEWCOMBE. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Appeals And Appellate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0178

  • Filing Date:

    12/10/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Infraction - Other Infraction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Appeals And Appellate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Appellant

CHRISTOPHER NEWCOMBE

Respondent

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

DISTRICT ATTORNEY

303 W Third St. Fifth Floor

San Bernardino, CA 92415-0511

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2011
  • CASE SENT TO STORAGE BOX #193

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2010
  • REMITTITUR ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2010
  • STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ALL OTHER JUDGMENTS BEFORE TRIAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2010
  • CASE STATUS SET TO CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2010
  • JUDGMENT WITHOUT OPINION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2010
  • APPEAL JUDGMENT AFFIRMED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2010
  • MINUTE ORDER: HEARING ON APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2010
  • NTC OF HEARING ON APPEAL-8/27/10 S20 @1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2010
  • CASE PREPPED FOR AUGUST APEPLLATE CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2010
  • APPELLANTS OPENING BRIEF FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 02/22/2010
  • ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE OPENING BRIEF FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2010
  • APPELLANTS OPENING BRIEF DUE 3/22/10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2010
  • REQUEST FOR EXTENSION TO FILE OPENING BRIEF FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2010
  • LATE LETTER SENT RE: NO BRIEF FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2010
  • APPELLANTS OPENING BRIEF DUE 2/15/10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2009
  • NOTICE OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2009
  • APPELLANTS OPENING BRIEF DUE 1/15/10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2009
  • RECORD ON APPEAL FILED CT-1 VOL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2009
  • APPEAL ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2009
  • SUPERIOR COURT # 45091KRCN - SAN BERN

    Read MoreRead Less