Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 06/06/2018 at 06:16:14 (UTC).

PEOPLE VS ALVIN ZINK

Case Summary

On 06/19/2009 PEOPLE filed an Other lawsuit against ALVIN ZINK. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Appeals And Appellate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0088

  • Filing Date:

    06/19/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Appeals And Appellate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Appellant

ALVIN ARTHUR ZINK III

Respondent

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

FINCH, DABNEY B

23905 Clinton Keith Ste 114, #161

Wildomar, CA 92595

Respondent Attorney

DISTRICT ATTORNEY

316 N Mt View Ave

San Bernardino, CA 92415

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2010
  • ATTY BILLING FORWARDED FOR PROCESSING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2010
  • REMITTITUR ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2010
  • STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ALL OTHER JUDGMENTS BEFORE TRIAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2010
  • CASE STATUS SET TO CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2010
  • JUDGMENT WITH OPINION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2010
  • APPEAL AFFIRMED AND REMANDED FOR RESENTENCING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2010
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON APPEAL FILED. APPELLATE HEARI NG 4/30/10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2009
  • APPELLANTS REPLY BRIEF FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2009
  • CASE PREPPED FOR APRIL 2010 APPELLATE CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2009
  • RESPONDENTS BRIEF FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 09/17/2009
  • APPELLANTS REQUEST FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME WHICH TO FILE APPELLANTS OPENING BRIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2009
  • NOTICE OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2009
  • APPELLANTS OPENING BRIEF DUE 9/28/09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2009
  • RECORD ON APPEAL FILED - CT 1 VOL, RT-1 VOL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2009
  • RECEIVED RETURN MAIL FOR APPELLANT-NEW ADDR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2009
  • REMAILED ORDER TO APPELLANT AT NEW ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2009
  • SUPERIOR COURT # MSB 902727 - SANBERN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2009
  • ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL (DABNEY FINCH) FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2009
  • MAILED PACKET TO ATTORNEY FINCH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2009
  • APPEAL ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less