This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 06/06/2018 at 06:16:10 (UTC).

PEOPLE VS ALONZO RILEY

Case Summary

On 06/17/2009 PEOPLE filed an Other lawsuit against ALONZO RILEY. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Appeals and Appellate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0087

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Appellant

ALONZO RILEY

Respondent

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

HURST, FREDERICK A

Po Box 620362

Las Vegas, NV 89162

Respondent Attorney

DISTRICT ATTORNEY

14455 Civic Dr.

Victorville, CA 92392

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2010
  • DocketATTY BILLING FORWARDED FOR PROCESSING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2010
  • DocketSTAGE AT DISPOSITION: ALL OTHER JUDGMENTS BEFORE TRIAL.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2010
  • DocketCASE STATUS SET TO CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2010
  • DocketREMITTITUR ISSUED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2010
  • DocketJUDGMENT WITH OPINION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2010
  • DocketAPPEAL AFFIRMED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2010
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING ON APPEAL FILED. HEARING MAY 21, 2010

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2010
  • DocketAPPELLANTS REPLY BRIEF FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2010
  • DocketCASE PREPPED FOR MAY 2010 APPELLATE CALENDAR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2009
  • DocketRESPONDENTS BRIEF FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 10/13/2009
  • DocketRESPONDENTS BRIEF DUE 11/12/09

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2009
  • DocketAPPELLANTS OPENING BRIEF FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2009
  • DocketAPPELLANTS OPENING BRIEF DUE 10/13/09

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2009
  • DocketNOTICE OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2009
  • DocketSUPPLEMENTAL CLERKS TRANSCRIPT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2009
  • DocketMEMO TO APPEALS CLERK - PREPARE SUPPLEMENTAL CLERKS TRANSCRIPT TO INCLUDE JURY QUESTIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2009
  • DocketRECORD ON APPEAL FILED CT-1 VOL, RT-1 VOLS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2009
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL (FRED HURST) FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2009
  • DocketAPPEAL ENTERED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2009
  • DocketSUPERIOR COURT # MVI901646 - VICTORVILLE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less