This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 03:15:51 (UTC).

PEOPLE VS $1,819.70

Case Summary

On 09/14/2017 PEOPLE filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against 1,819 70. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7810

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Claimant

LUIS MIGUEL LOZANO

Defendants

$560.00 U.S.CURRENCY

$1,259.70 U.S. CURRENCY

Respondent

$1,819.70 US CURRENCY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

DIST ATTORNEY/ASSET FORFEITUREUNIT

303 W 3Rd Street 3Rd Floor

San Bernardino, CA 92415

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS/SUBMISSION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS/SUBMISSION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; BRIAN S MCCARVILLE, JUDGE; CLERK: OLIVIA MCDONALD; COURT REPORTER DEENA MACIAS 9826; COURT ATTENDANT S CARR; APPEARANCES:; DEPUTY DA REBECA HYNDS PRESENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF COUNSEL FOR THE PEOPLE.; REASON: TO PREPARE 585 DEFAULT JUDGMENT; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 11/09/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S30.; NOTICE TO BE GIVEN BY PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • ORDER STRIKING THE CLAIM AND ENTERING THE DEFAULT OF CLAIMANT LUIS MIGUEL LOZANO FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER STRIKING THE CLAIM AND ENTERING THE DEFAULT OF CLAIMANT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST LUIS MIGUEL LOZANO FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON MISC. PETITION - CIVIL (UNLIMITED) FILED 09/14/2017 OF THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA AS TO LUIS MIGUEL LOZANO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • MOTION RE: TO STRIKE THE CLAIM AND ENTER THE DEFAULT OF LUIS MIGUEL LOZANO (02.13.18) FILED BY PETITIONER THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA; Disposition: GRANTED; Minutes; BRIAN S MCCARVILLE, JUDGE; CLERK: OLIVIA MCDONALD; COURT REPORTER ALICIA S. VASQUEZ 12225; COURT ATTENDANT S CARR; APPEARANCES:; DEPUTY DA REBECA HYNDS PRESENT.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: LUIS MIGUEL LOZANO; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA'S MOTION TO STRIKE CLAIM/ENTER DEF OF LUIS MIGUEL LOZANO IS HEARD.; 08:36; THE HALLWAY IS CALLED FOR LUIS MIGUEL LOZANO WITHOUT RESPONSE. COUNSEL FOR THE PEOPLE; INDICATES THAT CLAIMANT MAY BE INCARCERATED.; COURT FINDS:; THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA'S MOTION TO STRIKE CLAIM/ENTER DEF OF LUIS MIGUEL LOZANO IS GRANTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • STATUS HEARING ON PETITION; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; BRIAN S MCCARVILLE, JUDGE; CLERK: OLIVIA MCDONALD; COURT REPORTER ALICIA S. VASQUEZ 12225; COURT ATTENDANT S CARR; APPEARANCES:; DEPUTY DA REBECA HYNDS PRESENT.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: LUIS MIGUEL LOZANO; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF COUNSEL FOR THE PEOPLE.; REASON: TO SUBMIT A DEFAULT JUDGMENT PACKAGE; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : STATUS/SUBMISSION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT SET FOR 07/24/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S30.; ; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • STATUS HEARING ON PETITION; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; BRIAN S MCCARVILLE, JUDGE; CLERK: BRENDA TIRADO; COURT REPORTER DEENA MACIAS 9826; COURT ATTENDANT S CARR; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY REBECA HYNDS PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: LUIS MIGUEL LOZANO; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF COUNSEL.; REASON: TO BE HEARD WITH MOTION TO STRIKE CLAIM; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 03/27/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S30.; COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • MOTION RE: TO STRIKE THE CLAIM AND ENTER DEFAULT OF LUIS MIGU SET FOR HEARING ON 03/27/18, FILED BY PETITIONER THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 01/25/2018
  • MOTION RE: TO COMPEL ANSWER TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES FILED BY PETITIONER THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA; Disposition: GRANTED; Minutes; GILBERT OCHOA, JUDGE; CLERK: OLIVIA MCDONALD; COURT REPORTER DEENA MACIAS 9826; COURT ATTENDANT S CARR; APPEARANCES:; DEPUTY DA REBECA HYNDS PRESENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA'S MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES IS HEARD.; NO OPPOSITION PRESENTED.; COURT FINDS:; THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA'S MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES IS GRANTED.; RESPONSES TO BE PROVIDED WITHIN 15 DAYS; THE COURT IMPOSES SANCTIONS ON LUIS MIGUEL LOZANO IN THE AMOUNT OF $ $615.00 PAYABLE TO DISTRICT ATTORNEYS OFFICE FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUN ON OR BEFORE 02/10/18.; ORDER SIGNED THIS DATE.; NOTICE TO BE GIVEN BY COUNSEL FOR THE PEOPLE.; HEARING DATE OF 03/19/18 CONFIRMED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE SECTION 6103.5 FEES FOR THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA ARE WAIVED FOR MTN TO COMPEL ANSWERS IN THE AMOUNT OF $90.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • MOTION RE: TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES SET FOR HEARING ON 01/25/18, FILED BY PETITIONER THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • REQUEST RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT AS TO LAURA SONIA QUIROZ FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • SUPPLEMENTAL PETITION FILED ON MISC. PETITION - CIVIL (UNLIMITED) FILED 09/14/2017 OF THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • ON MISC. PETITION - CIVIL (UNLIMITED) FILED 09/14/2017 OF THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA FOR LUIS MIGUEL LOZANO, ATTORNEY PRO/PER ADDED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • SET DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO S30

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • PETITION FILED (CIVIL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PETITION FOR FORFEITURE FILED AS TO LUIS MIGUEL LOZANO. PARTY SERVED ON 09/14/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less