Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 06/06/2018 at 07:25:26 (UTC).

PEOPLE -V- WALTER CARL BACA

Case Summary

On 12/30/2010 PEOPLE filed an Infraction - Other Infraction lawsuit against WALTER CARL BACA. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Appeals And Appellate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0183

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Infraction - Other Infraction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Appeals And Appellate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Appellant

WALTER CARL BACA

Respondent

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

DISTRICT ATTORNEY

303 W Third St. Fifth Floor

San Bernardino, CA 92415-0511

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2012
  • CASE SENT TO RECORDS CENTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2011
  • REMITTITUR ISSUED. DECISION: APPEAL FROM FINAL JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION FILED ON 05/24/11.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2011
  • STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ALL OTHER JUDGMENTS BEFORE TRIAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2011
  • CASE STATUS SET TO CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2011
  • JUDGMENT WITHOUT OPINION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2011
  • APPEAL JUDGMENT IS AFFIRMED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2011
  • HEARING ON APPEAL; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; DAVID COHN, JUDGE; WILLIAM JEFFERSON POWELL, JUDGE; GREGORY S TAVILL, JUDGE; CLERK: CYNTHIA GOMEZ; COURT REPORTER LAVENDER LINO 13046; COURT ATTENDANT R BRUCATO; BAILIFF: JOY WILKE; NO APPEARANCE.; ACTION CAME ON FOR HEARING ON APPEAL.; CASE SUBMITTED ON BRIEFS.; THE JUDGMENT IS AFFIRMED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2011
  • LETTER FROM APPELLANT - SUBMITS ON THE BRIEFS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2011
  • CASE PREPARED FOR MAY CALENDAR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2011
  • AOB RCVD IN JT TODAY. IOM TO APP DIV IN CASE IT IS ORIGINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2011
  • RESPONDENT'S BRIEF DUE 03/09/11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2011
  • APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2011
  • NOTICE OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2011
  • APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF DUE 02/06/11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2010
  • APPEAL ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2010
  • SUPERIOR COURT CASE #23829KKWB - JOSHUA TREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2010
  • RECORD ON APPEAL FILED - CT 1 VOL

    Read MoreRead Less