This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 06/06/2018 at 13:49:42 (UTC).

PEOPLE-V- VILLAROSA VILLAMOR LINTON

Case Summary

On 01/06/2016 PEOPLE-V- VILLAROSA VILLAMOR LINTON was filed as an Infraction - Other Infraction lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Appeals And Appellate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0001

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Infraction - Other Infraction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Appeals And Appellate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Appellant

VILLAROSA VILLAMOR LINTON

Respondent

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

DISTRICT ATTORNEY

303 W Third St. Fifth Floor

San Bernardino, CA 92415-0511

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2016
  • ORDER MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF DISMISSAL OF APPEAL- DENIED FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • MOTION TO RECONSIDER DISMISSAL OF APPEAL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2016
  • APPEAL DISMISSED -- BEFORE HEARING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2016
  • APPEAL COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2016
  • LIMITED INFRACTION APPEAL FILED 01/06/2016 OF VILLAROSA LINTON COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2016
  • STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ALL OTHER JUDGMENTS BEFORE TRIAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2016
  • CASE STATUS SET TO CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2016
  • ORDER DISMISSAL OF APPEAL PURSUANT TO CRC 8.902(A) FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • CAUSE IN WRITING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2016
  • CAUSE IN WRITING DUE 02/12/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2016
  • ORDER SHOW CAUSE WHY APPEAL SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION- FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2016
  • UNTIMELY PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2016
  • APPEAL ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2016
  • SUPERIOR COURT CASE #AA93004VL- BARSTOW

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.