This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 06/06/2018 at 13:55:53 (UTC).

PEOPLE-V- TABITHA RENEE ACUNA

Case Summary

On 01/27/2016 PEOPLE-V- TABITHA RENEE ACUNA was filed as an Infraction - Other Infraction lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Appeals And Appellate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0009

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Infraction - Other Infraction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Appeals And Appellate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Appellant

TABITHA RENEE ACUNA

Respondent

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

DISTRICT ATTORNEY

303 W Third St. Fifth Floor

San Bernardino, CA 92415-0511

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2016
  • STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ALL OTHER JUDGMENTS BEFORE TRIAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2016
  • APPEAL COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2016
  • LIMITED INFRACTION APPEAL FILED 01/27/2016 OF TABITHA ACUNA COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2016
  • REMITTITUR ISSUED. DECISION: ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL FILED ON 07/21/16.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2016
  • NOTICE ON DECISION OF REMITTITUR PRINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2016
  • CASE STATUS SET TO CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2016
  • ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL PER CRC 8.927 (B) (1) FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2016
  • APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF DUE 06/27/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2016
  • LATE LETTER SENT: REGARDING RE: APPELLANTS OPENING BRIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2016
  • LATE LETTER SENT RE: FAILURE TO FILE APPELLANTS OPENING BRIEF PLACED IN FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2016
  • NOTICE OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2016
  • APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF DUE 04/28/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2016
  • RECORD ON APPEAL FILED - 1 VOL CT/ 1 ELECTRONIC CD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2016
  • APPEAL ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2016
  • SUPERIOR COURT CASE #5YBD0002LTA- BARSTOW

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.