This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 06/06/2018 at 13:58:42 (UTC).

PEOPLE-V- RUTH ZAPATA LOPEZ

Case Summary

On 03/14/2016 PEOPLE-V- RUTH ZAPATA LOPEZ was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Appeals And Appellate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0028

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Appeals And Appellate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Appellant

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Respondent

RUTH ZAPATA LOPEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

DISTRICT ATTORNEY

303 W Third St. Fifth Floor

San Bernardino, CA 92415-0511

Respondent Attorney

PUBLIC DEFENDER RANCHO CUCAMONGA

8303 N Haven Avenue 3Rd Floor

Rancho Cucamonga, CA 91730

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2017
  • COURT OF APPEAL ORDER-CASE SET FOR CALENDAR ON JUNE 27, 2017 TAKEN OFF CALENDAR UNTIL NTC PLACED IN FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2016
  • STAY ORDER RECEIVED FROM SUPREME COURT- ALL PROCEEDINGS STAYED PENDING FURTHER ORDER- PLACED IN FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2016
  • APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF DUE 07/25/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2016
  • ORDER GRANTING 2ND EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE APPELLANTS OPENING BRIEF FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • REQUEST FOR EXTENSION TO FILE APPELLANTS OPENING BRIEF FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF DUE 06/25/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE APPELLANTS OPENING BRIEF FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • REQUEST FOR EXTENSION TO FILE APPELLANTS OPENING BRIEF FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2016
  • NOTICE OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2016
  • APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF DUE 05/26/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2016
  • RECORD ON APPEAL FILED - 1 VOL CT/ 1 VOL RT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2016
  • SUPERIOR COURT CASE #TWV1502001-RANCHO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2016
  • APPEAL ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.