This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 06/06/2018 at 13:56:32 (UTC).

PEOPLE-V- ROMAN KHOLOVTAEV

Case Summary

On 02/01/2016 PEOPLE-V- ROMAN KHOLOVTAEV was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Appeals And Appellate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0013

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Appeals And Appellate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Appellant

ROMAN KHOLOVTAEV

Respondent

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

KAMIONSKI, MURRAY

1334 Parkview Ave #100

Redondo Beach, CA 90266

Respondent Attorney

DISTRICT ATTORNEY

303 W Third St. Fifth Floor

San Bernardino, CA 92415-0511

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2017
  • CLAIM IN THE AMOUNT OF $2,717.79 FORWARDED TO FINANCE & ADMINISTRATION OFFICE/INDIGENT DEFENSE FOR PAYMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ALL OTHER JUDGMENTS BEFORE TRIAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • REMITTITUR ISSUED. DECISION: PER CURIUM OPINION FILED ON 02/27/17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • NOTICE ON DECISION OF REMITTITUR PRINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • CASE STATUS SET TO CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • CLAIM IN THE AMOUNT OF $2,717.79 RECEIVED FROM MURRAY KAMIONSKI FOR 02/10/16 TO 03/02/17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • JUDGMENT WITH OPINION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • APPEAL AFFIRMED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • HEARING ON APPEAL; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; ARTHUR A HARRISON, JUDGE; ANNEMARIE G PACE, JUDGE; CARLOS CABRERA, JUDGE; CLERK: CHERYL FRANZEN; COURT REPORTER TERESA HIGH 11048; BAILIFF: LOZANO; NO APPEARANCE.; ACTION CAME ON FOR HEARING ON APPEAL.; CASE SUBMITTED ON BRIEFS.; THE JUDGMENT IS AFFIRMED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON APPEAL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 03/09/2016
  • NOTICE OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF DUE 04/08/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2016
  • RECORD ON APPEAL FILED - 1 VOL SUPPLEMENTAL CT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • RECORD ON APPEAL FILED - 1 VOL CT/ 2 VOLS RT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • APPEAL PACKET MAILED TO APPOINTED ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • ATTORNEY APPOINTMENT INFORMATION PLACED IN FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL MURRAY KAMIONSKI TO REPRESENT APPELLANT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • APPEAL ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • SUPERIOR COURT CASE #MWV1502178-RANCHO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • REQUEST FOR COURT APPOINTED ATTORNEY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less