Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 06/06/2018 at 07:41:05 (UTC).

PEOPLE -V- RICHARD RODRIGUEZ

Case Summary

On 02/22/2011 PEOPLE filed an Infraction - Other Infraction lawsuit against RICHARD RODRIGUEZ. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Appeals And Appellate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0028

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Infraction - Other Infraction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Appeals And Appellate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Appellant

RICHARD L RODRIGUEZ

Respondent

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

DISTRICT ATTORNEY

303 W Third St. Fifth Floor

San Bernardino, CA 92415-0511

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2012
  • CASE SENT TO RECORDS CENTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2012
  • ORDER - PETITION IS DENIED FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2012
  • PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2011
  • STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ALL OTHER JUDGMENTS BEFORE TRIAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2011
  • CASE STATUS SET TO CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2011
  • REMITTITUR ISSUED. DECISION: APPEAL FROM FINAL JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION FILED ON 09/27/11.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2011
  • JUDGMENT WITHOUT OPINION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2011
  • APPEAL JUDGMENT IS AFFIRMED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2011
  • HEARING ON APPEAL; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; WILLIAM JEFFERSON POWELL, JUDGE; JOHN M PACHECO, JUDGE; GILBERT OCHOA, JUDGE; CLERK: CYNTHIA GOMEZ; COURT REPORTER CYNTHIA GARCIA 12152; COURT ATTENDANT V AMADOR; RICHARD RODRIGUEZ PRESENT IN PRO PER.; FOLLOWING ORAL ARGUMENT BY RICHARD RODRIGUEZ, COURT TAKES CASE UNDER SUBMISSION.; THE JUDGMENT IS AFFIRMED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2011
  • CASE PREPARED FOR SEPTEMBER CALENDAR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2011
  • APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2011
  • RESPONDENT'S BRIEF DUE 05/18/11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2011
  • ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE OPENING BRIEF FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2011
  • APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF DUE 04/25/11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2011
  • REQUEST FOR EXTENSION TO FILE OPENING BRIEF FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2011
  • APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF DUE 03/26/11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2011
  • NOTICE OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2011
  • RECORD ON APPEAL FILED - CT 1 VOL / RT 1 VOL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2011
  • APPEAL ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2011
  • SUPERIOR COURT CASE #3231635RR - JOSHUA TREE

    Read MoreRead Less