This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 06/06/2018 at 13:59:26 (UTC).

PEOPLE-V- PRISCILLA CHAVEZ

Case Summary

On 03/29/2016 PEOPLE-V- PRISCILLA CHAVEZ was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Appeals And Appellate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0033

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Appeals And Appellate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Appellant

PRISCILLA CHAVEZ

Respondent

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

NEWMAN, TRISHA

1295 West Sunset Blvd.

Los Angeles, CA 90026

Respondent Attorney

DISTRICT ATTORNEY

303 W Third St. Fifth Floor

San Bernardino, CA 92415-0511

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2017
  • CLAIM IN THE AMOUNT OF $108.00 FORWARDED TO FINANCE & ADMINISTRATION OFFICE/INDIGENT DEFENSE FOR PAYMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • CLAIM IN THE AMOUNT OF $108.00 RECEIVED FROM TRISHA NEWMAN FOR 04/11/16 TO 07/18/16.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ALL OTHER JUDGMENTS BEFORE TRIAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • NOTICE ON DECISION OF REMITTITUR PRINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • NOTICE ON DECISION OF REMITTITUR PRINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • REMITTITUR ISSUED. DECISION: OPINION FILED ON 12/28/16.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2016
  • JUDGMENT WITHOUT OPINION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2016
  • APPEAL AFFIRMED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2016
  • CASE PREPARED FOR DECEMBER WENDE REVIEW CALENDAR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2016
  • NO SUPPLEMENTAL AOB FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 06/22/2016
  • REQUEST FOR EXTENSION TO FILE APPELLANTS OPENING BRIEF FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • NOTICE OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF DUE 06/23/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • RECORD ON APPEAL FILED - 1 VOL CT/1 VOL RT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • APPEAL PACKET MAILED TO APPOINTED ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • ORDER APPOINTING ATTORNEY TRISHA NEWMAN TO REPRESENT APPELLANT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • ATTORNEY APPOINTMENT INFORMATION PLACED IN FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2016
  • REQUEST FOR COURT APPOINTED LAWYER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2016
  • SUPERIOR COURT CASE #TSB1502326- SBJC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2016
  • APPEAL ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.