This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 06/06/2018 at 13:57:49 (UTC).

PEOPLE-V- MATTHEW RAY MILLER

Case Summary

On 02/22/2016 PEOPLE-V- MATTHEW RAY MILLER was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Appeals And Appellate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0022

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Appeals And Appellate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Appellant

MATTHEW RAY MILLER

Respondent

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF ERICCIOFFI

1581 Maidens Road

Maidens, VA 23102

Respondent Attorney

DISTRICT ATTORNEY

303 W Third St. Fifth Floor

San Bernardino, CA 92415-0511

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2017
  • CLAIM IN THE AMOUNT OF $378.00 RECEIVED FROM LAW OFFICE OF ERICCIOFFI FOR 03/28/16 TO 10/24/16.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • CASE STATUS SET TO CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • REMITTITUR ISSUED. DECISION: APPEAL FROM FINAL JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION FILED ON 10/24/16.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • NOTICE ON DECISION OF REMITTITUR PRINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ALL OTHER JUDGMENTS BEFORE TRIAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • JUDGMENT WITHOUT OPINION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • APPEAL JUDGMENT AFFIRMED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • CASE PREPARED FOR OCTOBER WENDE CALENDAR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • NO SUPP OPENING BRIEF FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2016
  • APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF DUE 07/08/16

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 05/04/2016
  • APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF DUE 06/03/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2016
  • NOTICE OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2016
  • APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF DUE 04/23/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2016
  • RECORD ON APPEAL FILED - 1 VOL CT/ 1 VOL RT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2016
  • ATTORNEY APPOINTMENT INFORMATION PLACED IN FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2016
  • APPEAL PACKET MAILED TO APPOINTED ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2016
  • ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL E.CIOFFI TO REPRESENT APPELLANT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • REQUEST FOR COURT APPOINTED LAWYER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • APPEAL ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • SUPERIOR COURT CASE #TVI1400810- VICTORVILLE

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.